Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:23-cv-00394
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:2271 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:Oct 31, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 5:56 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Plaintiff
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By
Kevin L Moyer
Moyer Law Firm PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
7 7 order Order Dismissing Case Terminate Civil Case Tue 10/31 10:43 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice pursuant to6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Parties to bear their own fees and costs. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 10/31/23. (dnj)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 10/23 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Moyer, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Mon 10/02 11:34 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. United States of America served on 9/25/2023, answer due 11/24/2023.(Moyer, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 09/19 1:56 PM
Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (jld)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 09/19 9:18 AM
Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (jld)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/18 1:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin L Moyer on behalf of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Moyer, Kevin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/18 1:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Moyer, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/18 1:14 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5356693.), filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Moyer, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit