Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Holly A Brady
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:23-cv-00395
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:Jul 08, 2024
Case in other court:Illinois Northern, 1:23-cv-04171
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 5:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Thomas Cioppa
Represented By
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Craig Arthur Oswald
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Madison Lo Dolce - AUSA
Us District Court - Ham/in
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Craig Arthur Oswald
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Madison Lo Dolce - AUSA
Us District Court - Ham/in
contact info
Defendant
David M. Satterfield
Represented By
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Craig Arthur Oswald
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Madison Lo Dolce - AUSA
Us District Court - Ham/in
contact info
Defendant
Christopher A. Wray
as the Director of the FBI Federal Bureau of Investigation 2111 W Roosevelt Rd
Chicago, IL 60608
Represented By
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Craig Arthur Oswald
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Madison Lo Dolce - AUSA
Us District Court - Ham/in
contact info
Defendant
Antony J Blinken
Represented By
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Craig Arthur Oswald
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Madison Lo Dolce - AUSA
Us District Court - Ham/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Ali Albakri
Represented By
Reem H Odeh
Law Offices Of Reem H. Odeh
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
26 26 order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 07/09 3:01 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The telephonic Show Cause Hearing and Status Conference set for 7/30/2024 at 11:00 am are vacated due to case dismissal. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
25 25 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 07/08 11:51 AM
TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/8/2024 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Atty Reem Odeh failed to appear on behalf of Plaintiff. Atty Madison Lo Dolce appeared on behalf of Defendants. Telephonic Show Cause Hearing/Status Conference set for 7/30/2024 at 11:00 am (EST). Court to initiate call. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Mon 07/08 11:19 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss by Defendants David M. Satterfield, Thomas Cioppa, Christopher A. Wray, Alejandro Mayorkas, Antony J Blinken. (Lo Dolce - AUSA, Madison)
Related: [-]
utility Dismissal Notice to Parties Pursuant to Rule 41a1 Mon 07/08 11:46 AM
CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure re24 Stipulation of Dismissal. (cer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
23 23 order Order Wed 07/03 1:42 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The Court takes no action on the Status Report (ECF22 ) given that the hearing on 7/8/2024 is set as a Status Conference. Text entry order. (ash)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
22 22 misc Status Report Tue 07/02 3:52 PM
STATUS REPORT by Antony J Blinken, Thomas Cioppa, Alejandro Mayorkas, David M. Satterfield, Christopher A. Wray. (Lo Dolce - AUSA, Madison)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
21 21 order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 07/01 8:59 AM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Because a Report of Parties Planning Meeting has not been filed by the parties, the Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2024 at 10:00 AM is VACATED and a Status Conference SET for 7/8/2024 at 10:00 AM. Court to initiate call. Text entry order. (ash) Modified on 7/1/2024 (ash)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/21 5:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Antony J Blinken, Thomas Cioppa, Alejandro Mayorkas, David M. Satterfield, Christopher A. Wray.(Lo Dolce - AUSA, Madison)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
19 19 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 02/21 1:17 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins:18 Defendants' Third Unopposed Motion Requesting an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and to Reset the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference is granted. The deadline for Dfts to file an Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to and including 6/29/2024. The telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2024 at 10:00 am is VACATED and RESET for 7/1/2024 at 10:00 am. Court to initiate call. Text entry order. (mr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 02/20 11:30 AM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint and Reset Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Defendants Antony J Blinken, Thomas Cioppa, Alejandro Mayorkas, David M. Satterfield, Christopher A. Wray. (Lo Dolce - AUSA, Madison)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 01/04 12:20 PM
ORDER: The Court will sua sponte GRANT the Plaintiff leave to amend his complaint for the limited purpose of revising it to reflect the dismissal of the identified Defendants.The Court DIRECTS the Plaintiff to file the amendment by 2/1/24. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 1/4/24. (nal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
16 16 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Wed 01/03 1:03 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Defendants David M. Satterfield, Thomas Cioppa, Christopher A. Wray, Alejandro Mayorkas, Antony J Blinken. (Lo Dolce - AUSA, Madison)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
15 15 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 11/29 1:10 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins:14 Defendants' Second Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is granted.The deadline for Dfts to file an Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to and including 3/31/2024. The telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2023 at 10:00 am is VACATED and RESET for 4/1/2024 at 10:00 am. court to initiate call. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 11/28 5:44 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint Unopposed by Defendants Antony J Blinken, Thomas Cioppa, Alejandro Mayorkas, David M. Satterfield, Christopher A. Wray. (Lo Dolce - AUSA, Madison)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
13 13 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 10/03 3:57 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The12 Motion to Extend Answer Deadline and Vacate Preliminary Pretrial Conference Setting is granted in part. The deadline for Dfts to file an Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to and including 12/2/2023. The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2023 at 11:00 am is VACATED and RESET for 12/12/2023 at 10:00 am. Court to initiate call. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 10/02 1:31 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint and Vacate Preliminary Pretrial Conference Setting by Defendants Antony J Blinken, Thomas Cioppa, Alejandro Mayorkas, David M. Satterfield, Christopher A. Wray. (Lo Dolce - AUSA, Madison)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/29 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Madison Lo Dolce - AUSA on behalf of All Defendants (Lo Dolce - AUSA, Madison)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
10 10 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Wed 09/20 9:19 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Wed 09/20 9:19 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2023 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call using telephone numbers appearing on docket. Cell phones are not permitted.(mr)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 09/18 1:27 PM
Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:23-cv-04171. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
7 7 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Northern District of Indiana the electronic record. (daj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
6 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: The parties' agreed motion to transfer venue and to extend time to answer or otherwise plead5 is granted. Defendants' are to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by or before October 3, 2023. The matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana, where Plaintiff resides, which is where venue properly lies under 28 U.S.C. § 1391(e). The Clerk shall transfer this action to the United States District Court, Northern District of Indiana, forthwith. Civil case transferred. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
5 5 MOTION by Defendants Antony J. Blinken, Thomas Cioppa, Alejandro Mayorkas, David M. Satterfield, Christopher A. Wray to transfer case Agreed Motion to Transfer Venue and Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Oswald, Craig) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
4 4 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Antony J. Blinken, Thomas Cioppa, Alejandro Mayorkas, David M. Satterfield, Christopher A. Wray (Oswald, Craig) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
3 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: The parties shall file a status report as to the progress of the visa petition on or before 10/23/2023. Mailed notice (smm) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
SUMMONS Issued as to Antony J. Blinken, Thomas Cioppa, Alejandro Mayorkas, Christopher A. Wray, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
2 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: The parties shall file a status report as to the visa petition by September 18, 2023. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2023.]
Related: [-]
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (evw, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2023.]
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (evw, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ali Albakri; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20783975.(Odeh, Reem) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit