Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Michael G Gotsch, Sr
Case #: 3:23-cv-00849
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:Mar 04, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 5:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
150 West Market St. Ste. 800
Indianapolis, IN 46515
Represented By
Erin V Bolden
Thor Industries Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Tomas Estrada
Represented By
Dmitry N Feofanov
Chicagolemonlaw.Com PC
contact info
Vincent L DiTommaso PHV
Ditommaso Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, March 04, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 03/04 3:01 PM
ORDER: The Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), with the parties to bear their own fees and costs. The Court DENIES AS MOOT Thor Motor Coach's motion to dismiss8 . This order terminates the case. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 3/4/2024. (ash)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 18, 2024
10 10 notice Notice - Other Sun 02/18 12:35 PM
NOTICE by Tomas Estrada of Voluntary Dismissal under Rule 41 (Feofanov, Dmitry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
9 9 6 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Tue 12/26 6:08 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Thor Motor Coach, Inc..(Bolden, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-- Limited Warranty
8 8 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 12/26 6:04 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Bolden, Erin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/13 4:35 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thor Motor Coach, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent THOR Industries Inc for Thor Motor Coach, Inc... (Bolden, Erin)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/13 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erin V Bolden on behalf of Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (Bolden, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
5 5 misc Certificate Tue 09/26 11:04 AM
CERTIFICATE CIVIL COVER SHEET . (DiTommaso PHV, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
4 4 misc Certificate Mon 09/25 11:14 AM
CERTIFICATE CIVIL COVER SHEET . (DiTommaso PHV, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
3 3 3 pgs order Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/22 8:01 AM
ORDER granting2 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Vincent L DiTommaso PHV for Tomas Estrada. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/21/2023. (ace)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
2 2 motion Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/19 9:12 AM
Application for Attorney VINCENT DITOMMASO to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of PLAINTIFF ESTRADA. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5357511(DiTommaso, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 09/19 12:58 PM
**NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/18 1:15 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Thor Motor Coach, Inc.( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5356694.), filed by Tomas Estrada.(Feofanov, Dmitry)
Related: [-]