California Northern District Court
Judge:Noel Wise
Case #: 5:23-cv-04781
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 2:47 AM PDT
Defendant
American-Paragon Protective Services, LLC
902 Crystal Falls Parkway
Leander, TX 78641
Represented By
Collin Dennis Cook
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Amaris Stich
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Defendant
Lynn Bala
300 E. STREET SW SUITE 5430
Washington, DC 20546
Represented By
Christopher Frederick Jeu
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA)
Represented By
Christopher Frederick Jeu
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Bill Nelson
300 E. STREET SW SUITE 5430
WASHINGTON, DC 20546
Represented By
Christopher Frederick Jeu
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Keith Siuda
NATIONAL AERONAUTICS AND SPACE ADMINISTRATION 300 E. STREET SW SUITE 5430
Washington, DC 20546
Represented By
Christopher Frederick Jeu
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Chenega Global Protection, LLC
Represented By
Michael C. Guasco
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cameron Gazaway
Represented By
Chambord V. Benton-Hayes
Benton Employment Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Wilson
Represented By
Chambord V. Benton-Hayes
Benton Employment Law
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Chenega Security & Support Solutions, LLC
Terminated: 12/18/2023
3000 C Street, Suite 301 Anchorage
Anchorage, AK 99503
Represented By
Michael C. Guasco
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Defendant
American Eagle Protective Services Corporation
Terminated: 01/18/2024

GPO Jul 10 2024
ORDER granting 48, 55 Motions to Dismiss with leave to amend. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 7/10/2024. (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 7/10/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
119 119 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 05/06 9:32 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byNational Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA), Bill Nelson.(Jeu, Christopher)
Related: [-] 118 First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Extend Deadlines in Scheduling Order re97 Order on Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Exs. A and B,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, May 02, 2025
118 118 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Fri 05/02 5:03 PM
First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Extend Deadlines in Scheduling Order re97 Order on Stipulation filed by Cameron Gazaway, Robert Wilson. Responses due by 5/6/2025.(Benton-Hayes, Chambord)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Chambord Benton-Hayes,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
117 117 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/02 2:50 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint against National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA). Filed by Cameron Gazaway, Robert Wilson.(Benton-Hayes, Chambord)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Redlined Complaint