Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Chad F Kenney
Case #: 2:23-cv-03616
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 9:55 AM EDT
Defendant
DREXEL UNIVERSITY
3141 CHESTNUT ST
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19104
Represented By
JOSEPH J. CENTENO
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
EMILY C. HEIMBECKER
Buchanan, Ingersoll & Rooney, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
GORDIAN NDUBIZU
PHD 5 MILTON COURT
PRINCETON JUNCTION, NJ 08550
Represented By
SUSAN L. SWATSKI
Hill Wallack LLP
contact info
PAUL R. SHEEHAN
Hill Wallack LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
49 49 misc Status Report Wed 03/12 5:46 PM
STATUS REPORT , JOINTLY SUBMITTED by GORDIAN NDUBIZU. (SHEEHAN, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
48 48 misc Status Report Mon 01/13 10:17 AM
STATUS REPORT , JOINTLY SUBMITTED by GORDIAN NDUBIZU. (SHEEHAN, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
47 47 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Wed 11/13 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by EMILY C. HEIMBECKER on behalf of DREXEL UNIVERSITY(HEIMBECKER, EMILY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
46 46 1 pgs order Order Tue 11/12 1:42 PM
ORDER THAT CASE WILL REMAIN STAYED UNTIL PLAINTIFF IS NO LATER IN A POSITION TO ASSERT OR WAIVES HIS 5TH AMENDMENT RIGHTS, ETC. FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PARTIESSHALL FILE A JOINT STATUS REPORT EVERY 60 DAYS REGARDING THE STATUS OF THE CRIMINAL CASE WHILE ITS ON APPEAL. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 11/12/24. 11/12/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
45 45 motion Brief and Statement Tue 11/05 5:50 PM
Plaintiff's Brief and Statement of Issues in Support of Request for Review DEFENDANT DREXEL UNIVERSITYS BRIEF ON WHETHER FIFTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS CAN BE ASSERTED IN A CIVIL CASE AFTER A CONVICTION WHILE THE CRIMINAL CASE IS ON APPEAL filed by DREXEL UNIVERSITY.Certificate of Service.(Kim, Minji)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Criminal Docket
44 44 6 pgs respoth Memorandum Tue 11/05 1:03 PM
Memorandum of Law per Order [ECF 43] re43 Order, by GORDIAN NDUBIZU. (SHEEHAN, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
43 43 1 pgs order Order Tue 10/15 2:52 PM
ORDER THAT THE CASE WILL REMAIN STAYED UNTIL PLAINTIFF IS NO LONGER IN A POSITION TO ASSERT OR WAIVES HIS FIFTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT BOTH PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT BRIEFS ON WHETHER FIFTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS CAN BE ASSERTED IN A CIVIL CASE AFTER A CONVICTION WHILE THE CRIMINAL CASE IS ON APPEAL BY 11/5/24. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 10/15/24. 10/15/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
42 42 misc Status Report Thu 10/10 3:05 PM
STATUS REPORT , JOINTLY SUBMITTED by GORDIAN NDUBIZU. (SHEEHAN, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
41 41 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/04 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Minji Kim on behalf of DREXEL UNIVERSITY with Certificate of Service(Kim, Minji)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
40 40 1 pgs order Order Wed 10/02 4:00 PM
ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A JOINT STATUS REPORT ON OR BEFORE 10/11/24. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 10/2/24. 10/2/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
39 39 trial Exhibit Fri 09/27 12:55 PM
EXHIBIT A to Joint Status Report [Document 38] filed on September 27, 2024 by DREXEL UNIVERSITY.. (HEIMBECKER, EMILY)
Related: [-]
38 38 misc Status Report Fri 09/27 11:12 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by DREXEL UNIVERSITY. (HEIMBECKER, EMILY)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
37 37 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 09/20 12:35 PM
ORDER: upon review of the Docket and it appearing that the criminal prosecution of Plaintiff Gordian Ndubizu has resolved, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before September 27, 2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/20/2024. 9/20/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sme)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
36 36 misc Status Report Fri 05/10 5:15 PM
STATUS REPORT , JOINTLY SUBMITTED by GORDIAN NDUBIZU. (SHEEHAN, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
35 35 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/03 3:34 PM
ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A JOINT STATUS REPORT ON OR BEFORE 5/10/24 THAT INDICATES WHETHER FACT DISCOVERY IS INDEED COMPLETE, OTHER THAN PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION AND WHETHER THE PARTIES INTEND TO RETAIN EXPERTS AND THE CURRENT STATUS OF EXPERT DISCOVERY. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 5/3/24. 5/3/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order Staying Case Fri 05/03 9:36 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY CIVIL PROCEEDINGS IS GRANTED AND THIS ACTION IS STAYED PENDING GORDIAN NDUBIZU'S CRIMINAL PROSECUTION AND FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE TRIAL PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR 8/26/24 IS CANCELLED AND ALL PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES ON THE AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER ARE STAYED PENDING PLAINTIFF'S CRIMINAL PROSECUTION AND FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 5/2/24. 5/3/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
33 33 30+ pgs respm Memorandum Mon 04/29 11:27 AM
Memorandum in Support re23 MOTION to Stay Defendant Drexel University's Motion to Stay Civil Proceedings filed by DREXEL UNIVERSITY. (HEIMBECKER, EMILY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
32 32 misc Stipulation Tue 04/23 3:28 PM
STIPULATION re30 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,26 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings by GORDIAN NDUBIZU.(SHEEHAN, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, April 22, 2024
31 31 minutes Telephone Conference Mon 04/22 4:44 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY. Telephone Conference held on 4/19/24. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 04/19 3:35 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE THE STIPULATION REFERENCED IN THE COURT'S APRIL 12, 2024 ORDER (ECF NO. [29}), THE MOTION IS GRANTED; PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE THE STIPULATION ON OR BEFORE APRIL 23, 2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 04/19/2024.04/19/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 04/18 10:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation filed by GORDIAN NDUBIZU..(SHEEHAN, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
28 28 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/18 3:16 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION to Stay Defendant Drexel University's Motion to Stay Civil Proceedings filed by GORDIAN NDUBIZU.(SHEEHAN, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, April 15, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 04/15 2:20 PM
ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND THE FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS GRANTED. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 4/30/24. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/15/24. 4/15/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/15 8:37 AM
NOTICE THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO STAY CIVIL PROCEEDINGS NO LATER THAN 4/18/24. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/12/24. 4/15/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/15 10:09 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to23 MOTION to Stay Defendant Drexel University's Motion to Stay Civil Proceedings . RESPONSES DUE BY 4/18/2024. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 04/11 9:46 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by GORDIAN NDUBIZU..(SHEEHAN, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
24 24 minutes Settlement Conference Wed 04/10 8:50 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI Settlement Conference held on 4/9/24. (JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
23 23 motion Stay Thu 04/04 4:49 PM
MOTION to Stay Defendant Drexel University's Motion to Stay Civil Proceedings filed by DREXEL UNIVERSITY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(HEIMBECKER, EMILY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Stay Civil Proceedings,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - 5/12/2022 U.S. Attorney's Office Press Release,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - 2022 Indictment,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - 5/13/2022 Notice of Administrative Leave,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Excerpts of Plaintiff's March 24, 2024 Deposition,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service,
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 11, 2024
22 22 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/11 3:19 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: THE PARTIES' JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND THE DISCOVERY DEADLINES IS GRANTED. EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 5/28/24. ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 6/11/24. MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED BY 8/5/24. ALL PARTIES ARE TO FILE FINAL PRETRIAL MEMORANDA ON OR BEFORE 8/12/24. A DATE CERTAIN JURY TRIAL WILL COMMENCE ON 8/26/24 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11B. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/11/24. 3/11/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 03/07 10:27 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by GORDIAN NDUBIZU.Certificate of Service.(SHEEHAN, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Monday, March 04, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/04 6:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY C. HEIMBECKER on behalf of DREXEL UNIVERSITY with Certificate of Service(HEIMBECKER, EMILY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
19 19 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 02/07 4:44 PM
ORDER THAT A VIDEO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 4/9/2024 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 2/7/24. 2/7/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/03 3:19 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: EXPERT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 5/14/2024. ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 6/11/24. MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED BY 8/5/24. ALL PARTIES ARE TO PREPARE AND FILE PRETRIAL MEMORANDA BY 8/12/24. A DATE CERTAIN TRIAL WILL COMMENCE ON 8/26/24 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11B BEFORE HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/3/24. 1/3/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Wed 01/03 3:08 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI TO CONDUCT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROVIDED THE PARTIES CERTIFY THEY ARE READY TO PROCEED WITH ONE IN GOOD FAITH. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/3/24. 1/3/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 01/03 11:37 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY in Courtroom 11B. Rule 16 Pretrial Conference held on 1/3/24. Court Reporter: ESR. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
15 15 misc Report Of Fri 12/29 10:34 AM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting (Joint) by DREXEL UNIVERSITY. (CENTENO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 12/05 11:52 AM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI TO CONDUCT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT AN IN PERSON ON THE RECORD INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) IS SCHEDULED FOR 1/3/24 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE THE HON. CHAD F. KENNEY, IN COURTROOM 11B. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 12/4/23. 12/5/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
13 13 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Fri 12/01 1:26 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by DREXEL UNIVERSITY.(CENTENO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/01 1:23 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by DREXEL UNIVERSITY.(CENTENO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/01 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH J. CENTENO on behalf of DREXEL UNIVERSITY with Certificate of Service(CENTENO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 11/29 8:49 AM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF SUSAN L. SWATSKI, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 11/28/23. 11/29/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
9 9 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/22 1:46 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Susan Swatski by GORDIAN NDUBIZU.( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17086085.) (SHEEHAN, PAUL) Modified on 11/22/2023 (md)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
8 8 2 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Tue 11/21 2:52 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT DREXEL UNIVERSITY SHALL HAVE UNTIL 12/1/2023 TO FILE ITS ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 11/21/23. 11/21/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
7 7 misc Stipulation Mon 11/20 3:02 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint (Attorney), (Joint) by DREXEL UNIVERSITY. (CENTENO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 01, 2023
6 6 discov Disclosure of Citizenship Sun 10/01 1:45 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by GORDIAN NDUBIZU . (SHEEHAN, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 09/27 6:10 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GORDIAN NDUBIZU. DREXEL UNIVERSITY waiver sent on 9/20/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. (SHEEHAN, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/20 3:54 PM
ORDER THAT EACH PARTY TO THE ACTION IS REQUIRED TO FILE OF RECORD THEIR DISCLOSURE OF CITIZENSHIP IN DIVERSITY JURISDICTION CASES (FORM ATTACHED). SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/20/23. 9/20/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Wed 09/20 3:52 PM
ORDER THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6), (e), OR (f), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTER. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST 7 DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/20/23. 9/20/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 09/19 12:39 PM
Summons Issued as to DREXEL UNIVERSITY. Forwarded To: counsel on 9/19/23. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 09/18 3:13 PM
COMPLAINT against DREXEL UNIVERSITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16951853.), filed by GORDIAN NDUBIZU.(SHEEHAN, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Designation Form