California Northern District Court
Judge:Sallie Kim
Case #: 3:23-cv-04782
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:Dec 18, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 2:47 AM PDT
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Connie Nolan
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Michael Valverde
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Cuibin JI
Represented By
Eric Joseph Martin
Law Office Of Anders Johnson
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, December 18, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 12/18 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cuibin JI (Martin, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 11/27 10:38 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 12 Stipulation to Stay. Status Report due by 3/4/2024. (sklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 24, 2023
12 12 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 11/24 12:49 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; filed by Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan, Michael Valverde. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 11/24 12:48 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan, Michael Valverde.. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/24 12:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 10/05 11:21 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cuibin JI.. (Martin, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 10/04 11:04 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/18/2023 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/18/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 09/22 11:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan, Michael Valverde, (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
6 6 misc Proposed Summons Thu 09/21 3:40 PM
Proposed Summons.(Martin, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
5 5 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Tue 09/19 2:18 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/19 1:31 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/3/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 09/19 1:21 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Cuibin JI Civil Cover Sheet Re: 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Cuibin JI (bar, COURT STAFF) . (Martin, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 09/18 1:44 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Cuibin JI . (Martin, Eric)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/18 12:45 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18653111.). Filed byCuibin JI.(Martin, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 09/18 1:08 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Civil Cover Sheet missing Section V Origin. No judge assignment will be made until the amended document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re:1 Complaint filed by Cuibin JI (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 09/18 3:55 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Civil Cover Sheet missing Section V Origin. No judge assignment will be made until the amended document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re:2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Cuibin JI (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]