California Northern District Court
Judge:Joseph C Spero
Case #: 3:23-cv-04783
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:Feb 06, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 2:47 AM PDT
Defendant
Anthony J. Blinken
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Merrick B. Garland
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Department of State
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Adriana Mason
Represented By
Zachary Miller Nightingale
Van Der Hout, Brigagliano & Nightingale, LLP
contact info
Rebecca Kutlow
Van Der Hout LLP
contact info
Zachary Nightingale
Van Der Hout, Brigagliano & Nightingale, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nidia Del Socorro Roa de Mayorga
Represented By
Zachary Miller Nightingale
Van Der Hout, Brigagliano & Nightingale, LLP
contact info
Rebecca Kutlow
Van Der Hout LLP
contact info
Zachary Nightingale
Van Der Hout, Brigagliano & Nightingale, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 02/06 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Complaint for Declaratory, Mandamus and Injunctive Relief, and Review Under the Administrative Procedure Act and Mandamus Act by Adriana Mason, Nidia Del Socorro Roa de Mayorga (Kutlow, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 02/01 9:52 AM
Order. Signed 2/1/2024 by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 15 Third Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which Defendants Must File a Response. Plaintiffs Dispositive Motion due by 4/18/2024. Defendants Dispositive Motion due by 5/23/2024. (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
15 15 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 01/31 4:55 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Third Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which Defendants Must File a Response and [Proposed] Order filed by Anthony J. Blinken, Merrick B. Garland, U.S. Department of State. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
14 14 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 12/21 2:30 PM
Order. Signed 12/21/2023 by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 13 Second Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which Defendants Must File a Response.(klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
13 13 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 12/20 4:41 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Second Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which Defendants Must File a Response and [Proposed] Order filed by Anthony J. Blinken, Merrick B. Garland, U.S. Department of State. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
12 12 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 11/27 8:32 AM
ORDER. Signed 11/27/2023 by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 11 Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which Defendants Must File a Response. (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
11 11 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 11/21 8:13 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which Defendants Must File a Response and [Proposed] Order filed by Anthony J. Blinken, Merrick B. Garland, U.S. Department of State. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 11/21 8:12 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthony J. Blinken, Merrick B. Garland, U.S. Department of State.. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/21 8:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
8 8 service Acknowledgment of Service Affidavit of Service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 09/22 2:53 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to5 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order,4 Summons Issued as to USA,1 Complaint,6 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Acknowledgement filed by Adriana Mason, Nidia Del Socorro Roa de Mayorga., AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Adriana Mason, Nidia Del Socorro Roa de Mayorga., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adriana Mason, Nidia Del Socorro Roa de Mayorga (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Fri 09/22 2:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adriana Mason, Nidia Del Socorro Roa de Mayorga. Anthony J. Blinken served on 9/22/2023, answer due 11/21/2023; Merrick B. Garland served on 9/22/2023, answer due 11/21/2023; U.S. Department of State served on 9/22/2023, answer due 11/21/2023. (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 09/21 10:52 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adriana Mason, Nidia Del Socorro Roa de Mayorga.. (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
5 5 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Tue 09/19 11:18 AM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 09/19 11:14 AM
Summons Issued as to Anthony J. Blinken, Merrick B. Garland, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/18 1:56 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 09/18 1:00 PM
Proposed Summons. (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/18 12:58 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory, Mandamus, and Injunctive Relief against Anthony J. Blinken, Merrick B. Garland, U.S. Department of State ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18653211.). Filed byAdriana Mason, Nidia Del Socorro Roa de Mayorga.(Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet