California Northern District Court
Judge:William H Orrick
Case #: 4:23-cv-04784
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 2:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Meta Platforms, Inc.
Represented By
Darcy Caitlyn Harris
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Michael Graham Rhodes
Cooley LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Katharine McCloskey
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Kyle C. Wong
Cooley LLP
contact info
Abigail Augus Barrera
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Caroline A. Lebel
Cooley LLP
contact info
Lauren R. Goldman
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
E. H.
Represented By
Frank H. Busch
Coblentz, Patch, Duffy & Bass LLP
contact info
Steven Joseph Adamski
Adamski Moroski Madden Cumberland & Green LLP
contact info
James Matthew Wagstaffe
Adamski Moroski Madden Cumberland & Green LLP
contact info
Abigail Burman
Motley Rice
contact info
Mathew P. Jasinski
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Previn Warren
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
C. S.
Represented By
Steven Joseph Adamski
Adamski Moroski Madden Cumberland & Green LLP
contact info
James Matthew Wagstaffe
Adamski Moroski Madden Cumberland & Green LLP
contact info
Abigail Burman
Motley Rice
contact info
Mathew P. Jasinski
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Previn Warren
Motley Rice LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, October 27, 2023
26 26 1 pgs order Order Relating Case ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10/27 11:30 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER - This case is found to be related to Case No. 22-cv-3580-WHO. This case shall not be covered by the 10/12/2022 Order to Consolidate. Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2023 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due 12/5/2023. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/27/2023. (jmd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/25 12:18 PM
Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mathew Jasinski.(mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
24 24 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/23 10:43 AM
Third MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18762273.) filed by E. H., C. S..(Jasinski, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing
23 23 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 10/23 10:15 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byE. H., C. S..(Busch, Frank)
Related: [-] 22 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint re1 Complaint
Att: 1 Declaration of Abigail Burman in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposiiton to Defendant's Administrative Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint
Thursday, October 19, 2023
22 22 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Thu 10/19 4:03 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint re1 Complaint filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Responses due by 10/23/2023.(McCloskey, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Elizabeth K. McCloskey,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 10/17 9:24 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED REQUEST TO ESTABLISH MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 18 Stipulation. Motions due by 11/1/2023. Responses due by 11/22/2023. Replies due by 12/6/2023. (mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
20 20 order Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Thu 10/12 7:59 AM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 22-cv-3580-WHO. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2023. (mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
19 19 3 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Thu 10/12 7:53 AM
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFFS E.H. AND C.S. TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 3 Administrative Motion.(mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
18 18 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 10/11 3:08 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re1 Complaint Stipulated Request to Establish Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule filed by Meta Platforms, Inc..(McCloskey, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Elizabeth K. McCloskey,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
17 17 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 10/11 3:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meta Platforms, Inc. (McCloskey, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/11 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Katharine McCloskey (McCloskey, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/26 4:57 PM
Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Abigail Burman.(mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/26 4:55 PM
Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Previn Warren.(mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 09/25 12:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by E. H., C. S.. Meta Platforms, Inc. served on 9/20/2023, answer due 10/11/2023. (Busch, Frank)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/25 11:08 AM
Second MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18674990.) filed by E. H., C. S..(Burman, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/25 7:59 AM
First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18673978.) filed by E. H., C. S..(Warren, Previn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement
Thursday, September 21, 2023
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Thu 09/21 4:46 PM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than December 11, 2023 by 2:00 p.m. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/21 3:25 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 9/21/2023.(bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 09/21 11:46 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/20 1:46 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by E. H., C. S... (Busch, Frank)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 09/19 9:20 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 09/19 9:09 AM
Summons Issued as to Meta Platforms, Inc.. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/18 2:11 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Mon 09/18 1:32 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Plaintiffs E.H. and C.S. to Proceed Pseudonymously filed by E. H., C. S.. Responses due by 9/22/2023.(Busch, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order For Plaintiffs E.H. and C.S. to Proceed Pseudonymously
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 09/18 1:18 PM
Proposed Summons. (Busch, Frank)
Related: [-]
1 1 36 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/18 1:08 PM
COMPLAINT -Class Action against Meta Platforms, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18653244.). Filed byE. H., C. S..(Busch, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet