California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 4:23-cv-04785
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 2:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Citrus World, Inc.
Represented By
Christina Yachiyo Taylor
Latham, Luna, Eden & Beaudine, LLP
contact info
Willis M Wagner
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Daniel Howard Coultoff
Latham Shuker Eden Beaudine LLP
contact info
Rica Katrina Santos
Arnold Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Anne Foster
Represented By
Erin Johnson Ruben
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info
John Hunter Bryson
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info
Trenton Ross Kashima
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Madeleine Rogow
Represented By
Erin Johnson Ruben
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info
John Hunter Bryson
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info
Trenton Ross Kashima
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, October 02, 2023
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Mon 10/02 4:26 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 10/02 3:15 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anne Foster, Madeleine Rogow.. (Bryson, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/29 10:22 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18692421.) filed by Anne Foster, Madeleine Rogow.(Bryson, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/29 10:19 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18692358.) filed by Anne Foster, Madeleine Rogow.(Ruben, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing
Thursday, September 28, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/28 11:13 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anne Foster, Madeleine Rogow. Citrus World, Inc. served on 9/19/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. (Kashima, Trenton)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 09/18 5:02 PM
Summons Issued as to Citrus World, Inc.. (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 09/18 4:59 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/18 1:27 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 09/18 1:27 PM
Proposed Summons. (Kashima, Trenton)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/18 1:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Citrus World, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18653310.). Filed byAnne Foster, Madeleine Rogow.(Kashima, Trenton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet