California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 4:23-cv-04788
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:Nov 06, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 2:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By
Sharon Cohen Collier
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Nathaniel Le Roi Dunn
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alfonsina Iginia Banos Laredo
Represented By
Christopher Bates Adamson
Adamson Ahdoot LLP
contact info
Alan Amir Ahdoot
Adamson Ahdoot LLP
contact info
Saad B Sweilem
Adamson Ahdoot LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 29 2023
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 11 Stipulated for Protective Order. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, November 27, 2023
14 14 oth_evt Clerks Notice ADI Mon 11/27 12:09 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable Rita F. Lin in the San Francisco Division for all further proceedings. 1. All future filings shall bear the initials RFL immediately after the case number. 2. All case management conference dates are vacated and will be reset by the Court. 3. All hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED . However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. All pending motions Related [+] must be RENOTICED for hearing before Judge Lin by the moving party for a date consistent with the Court’s law and motion calendar, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. 4. Deadlines for ADR compliance and discovery cutoffs remain unchanged. 5. All pretrial conference and trial dates currently set for after March 4, 2024 , and all other deadlines associated with the case, will remain in place unless otherwise ordered. 6. All pretrial conference and trial dates scheduled on or before March 4, 2024, are vacated. Other pretrial deadlines ( eg. , motions in limine, pretrial statements, proposed joint trial exhibits, etc.) will remain in place. The Court will notify the parties when a status conference will be held to schedule a new pretrial conference and trial dates for affected cases. 7. Matters currently referred to a Magistrate Judge will remain before that Magistrate Judge absent further notice. 8. Each party is expected to review and become familiar with all applicable standing orders and scheduling notes. 9. On or before December 11, 2023 , the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement (separate statements are appropriate if either party is proceeding without counsel). The statement should not exceed ten pages in length and should address the following items in the following order: a. Date Filed : The date the case was filed; b. Parties : A list or description of each party; c. Claims : A summary of all claims, counter-claims, cross-claims, or third party claims; d. Facts : A brief chronology of the facts and a statement of the principal factual issues in dispute; e. Legal Issues : A brief statement, without extended legal argument, of the disputed points of law, including reference to specific statutes and decisions; f. Relief : A description of the relief sought and the damages claimed with an explanation as to how damages have been (or will be) computed; g. Discovery : The status of discovery, including any significant discovery management issues, as well as any limits or cutoff dates; h. Related Cases : The status, case name, and case number of any related cases or proceedings pending before another judge of this court, or before another court or administrative body; i. Procedural History : A procedural history of the case, including any previous motions that were decided or submitted, any ADR proceedings or settlement conferences that have been scheduled or concluded, any appellate proceedings that are pending or concluded, and any previous referral to a magistrate judge; j. Deadlines : A description of any other deadlines in place before reassignment, including those for ADR, dispositive motions, pretrial conferences, and trials; k. Any modification of deadlines : Any requested modification of these dates, and the reasons for the request; l. Consent to Magistrate : Whether the parties will consent to a magistrate judge for trial; and m. Emergency : Whether there exists an immediate need for a case management conference to be scheduled in the action, and why the parties believe such a need exists. 10. The Joint Case Management Statement will not constitute a motion to extend or modify dates. If emergency relief is needed to modify a deadline, and the deadline is not of the type that can be modified via stipulation of the parties without a court order, the requesting party or parties shall additionally file a motion or stipulation for such relief in compliance with Local Rule 6. 11. The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. Hearings and trials in any civil case assigned to a judge participating in the Pilot Project are eligible for video recording, upon request and with the consent of the parties and the presiding judge. Please see the [LINK:Northern Districts webpage about participation in the Pilot Project] and [LINK:General Order 65] for more information. IT IS SO ORDERED. Dated: 11/27/2023 FOR THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE Mark B. Busby, Clerk of Court (kab-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] gardless of whether they are presently scheduled for hearing
Monday, November 06, 2023
13 13 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 11/06 3:53 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Dismiss entire action filed by Alfonsina Iginia Banos Laredo. (Sweilem, Saad)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
12 12 13 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 09/29 2:40 PM
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 11 Stipulated for Protective Order. (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 09/29 9:15 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Dunn, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Nathaniel L. Dunn in Support of Stipulation for Protective Order
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/26 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Saad B Sweilem (Sweilem, Saad)
Related: [-]
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Telephonic Hearing (AT&T) Tue 09/26 9:11 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for January 2, 2024, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by December 26th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:23-cv-04788-HSG. The January 2, 2024 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for a telephonic case management conference are required to dial-in at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/26 8:58 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 9/26/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Mon 09/25 6:45 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/25 11:58 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Costco Wholesale Corporation.. (Dunn, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 09/19 1:17 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/18 4:34 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2023. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 09/18 2:28 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Dunn, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 09/18 2:27 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Dunn, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 09/18 2:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, Contra Costa County. Their case number is C23-01924. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18653810). Filed byCostco Wholesale Corporation.(Dunn, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to RFJN - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to RFJN - Answer,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to RFJN - Amended and Restated Articles of Incorporation,
Att: 5 Declaration of Nathaniel L. Dunn in Support of Notice of Removal,
Att: 6 Exhibit A to Dunn Dec - Return of Service,
Att: 7 Exhibit B to Dunn Dec - Correspondence,
Att: 8 Exhibit C to Dunn Dec. - Redacted Incident Report,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet