California Northern District Court
Judge:P Casey Pitts
Case #: 5:23-cv-04786
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:Dec 12, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 2:49 AM PDT
Defendant
PIMIC, Inc.
Represented By
David Yang
Hawkinson Yang LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Synopsys, Inc.
Represented By
Denise Marie Mingrone
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 12 2023
ORDER re Settlement and Dismissal of Case With Prejudice. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 12/12/2023. The Clerk shall close the file. (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 12/12/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
22 22 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 12/12 1:14 PM
ORDER re Settlement and Dismissal of Case With Prejudice. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 12/12/2023. The Clerk shall close the file. (nmc, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
21 21 misc Proposed Order Fri 12/08 2:36 PM
Proposed Order [Proposed Order re Settlement and Dismissal of Case with Prejudice] by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
20 20 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Fri 12/01 4:39 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mingrone, Denise)
Related: [-]
19 19 adr ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance after 5/1/2018 Fri 12/01 12:20 PM
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
18 18 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 11/13 4:26 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Complaint (Second Stipulation) filed by PIMIC, Inc.. (Yang, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
17 17 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 10/03 6:30 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Complaint filed by PIMIC, Inc.. (Yang, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
16 16 misc Proposed Order Tue 09/26 3:16 PM
Proposed Order [Stipulated Protective Order for Litigation Involving Patents, Highly Sensitive Confidential Information and/or Trade Secrets] by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Order on Stipulation Fri 09/22 12:17 PM
ORDER granting 12 Stipulation Granting Plaintiff Synopys, Inc.'s Ex Parte Motion for Entry of Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery; finding as moot 11 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts 9/22/2023. (nmc, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
14 14 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 09/21 8:45 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by PIMIC, Inc. (Yang, David)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/21 8:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Yang for Defendant PIMIC Inc. (Yang, David)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 09/21 5:08 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re11 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; Order to Show Cause re PI; Order for Expedited Discovery; and Memo of Points and Authorities filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Temporary Restraining Order Thu 09/21 11:20 AM
Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; Order to Show Cause re PI; Order for Expedited Discovery; and Memo of Points and Authorities filed by Synopsys, Inc..(Mingrone, Denise)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Denise M. Mingrone ISO Motion for TRO; Order to Show Cause Re PI; and Order for Expedited Discovery,
Att: 2 Declaration of Daniel E. Roffman ISO Motion for TRO; Order to Show Cause Re PI; and Order for Expedited Discovery,
Att: 3 Declaration of Anthony Bradley ISO Motion for TRO; Order to Show Cause Re PI; and Order for Expedited Discovery,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/19 1:02 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2023 at 01:00 PM before Judge P. Casey Pitts in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/19 8:59 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge P. Casey Pitts for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/19/2023.(bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Monday, September 18, 2023
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Mon 09/18 4:54 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/18 3:55 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Synopsys, Inc... (Mingrone, Denise)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 09/18 3:32 PM
Summons Issued as to PIMIC, Inc. (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 09/18 3:28 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/18 2:06 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2023. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 09/18 1:37 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Synopsys, Inc. (Mingrone, Denise)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 09/18 1:31 PM
Proposed Summons. (Mingrone, Denise)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/18 1:27 PM
COMPLAINT against PIMIC, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18653374.). Filed bySynopsys, Inc..(Mingrone, Denise)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet