California Northern District Court
Judge:Alex G Tse
Case #: 3:23-cv-04790
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:Nov 14, 2023
Case in other court:Contra Costa Superior Court, C23-01432
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 2:50 AM PDT
Defendant
SLT Lending SPV, Inc.
Represented By
Victoria Leigh Weatherford
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
David Keifer
Represented By
Abbas Kazerounian
Kazerounian Law Group, Apc
contact info
Mona Amini
Kazerouni Law Group, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Transfer Case Tue 11/14 10:55 AM
ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 11 Motion. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Tue 11/14 3:39 PM
case electronically transmitted to the Northern District of Indiana. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
16 16 oth_sup Statement of Non-Opposition Fri 11/10 9:11 AM
Statement of Non-Opposition re11 MOTION to Transfer Case *Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) for Lack of Personal Juri MOTION to Transfer Case *Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) for Lack of Personal Juri MOTION to Transfer Case *Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) for Lack of Personal Juri filed byDavid Keifer. Related [+] (Amini, Mona)
Related: [-] 11
Friday, October 27, 2023
15 15 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 10/27 2:34 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Keifer.. (Amini, Mona)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 10/25 10:41 AM
CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/27/2023. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Plaintiff's counsel was also notified via telephone.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 09/26 10:06 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/2/2023. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
12 12 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Mon 09/25 3:37 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re11 MOTION to Transfer Case *Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) for Lack of Personal Juri MOTION to Transfer Case *Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) for Lack of Personal Juri MOTION to Transfer Case *Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) for Lack of Personal Juri filed bySLT Lending SPV, Inc.. Related [+] (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 motion Transfer Case Mon 09/25 3:33 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case *Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Motion to Stay Case Pending Decision on Transfer on Personal Jurisdiction* filed by SLT Lending SPV, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Responses due by 10/10/2023. Replies due by 10/17/2023.(Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Victoria L. Weatherford in Support of Motion to Transfer,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
10 10 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/25 11:10 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by SLT Lending SPV, Inc... (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
9 9 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 09/19 3:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SLT Lending SPV, Inc. re 6 Case Assigned by Intake,, (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 09/19 2:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SLT Lending SPV, Inc. re2 Notice (Other),4 Certificate of Interested Entities,5 Declaration in Support,3 Request for Judicial Notice,1 Notice of Removal, (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 09/19 2:17 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/15/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/19 8:45 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/3/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
5 5 oth_sup Declaration in Support Mon 09/18 5:00 PM
Declaration of Victoria L. Weatherford in Support of1 Notice of Removal, filed bySLT Lending SPV, Inc. d/b/a Sur La Table. Related [+] (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-] 1
4 4 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 09/18 4:51 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by SLT Lending SPV, Inc. d/b/a Sur La Table identifying Corporate Parent SLT Lending SPV, Inc. for SLT Lending SPV, Inc. d/b/a Sur La Table. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Mon 09/18 4:35 PM
Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Notice of Removal of Civil Action From State Court filed bySLT Lending SPV, Inc. d/b/a Sur La Table.(Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Mon 09/18 4:24 PM
NOTICE by SLT Lending SPV, Inc. d/b/a Sur La Table of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding(Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 09/18 4:09 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action From State Court from Contra Costa Superior Court. Their case number is C23-01432. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18654865). Filed bySLT Lending SPV, Inc. d/b/a Sur La Table.(Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet