California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 4:23-cv-04792
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:2674 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 2:50 AM PDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Valerie Elizabeth Smith
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Michael A. Keough
The United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Hector E.C.L.
Represented By
Emily Anne Reitmeier
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Josh Samuel Brown
Skadden Arps
contact info
Christian D. Soler
Skadden Arps
contact info
Plaintiff
Karina R.L.L.
Represented By
Emily Anne Reitmeier
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Josh Samuel Brown
Skadden Arps
contact info
Christian D. Soler
Skadden Arps
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, November 02, 2023
21 21 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 11/02 4:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hector E.C.L., Karina R.L.L. Proof of Service of Summons, Complaint and supporting documents Related [+]
Related: [-] itmeier, Emily
20 20 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 11/02 3:57 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Keough, Michael)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/02 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Keough (Keough, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
18 18 misc Redacted Document Fri 10/13 12:30 PM
REDACTION to9 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Karina R.L.L., Hector E.C.L.. Related [+]
Related: [-] itmeier, Emily
17 17 misc Redacted Document Fri 10/13 12:03 PM
REDACTION to6 Proposed Summons by Karina R.L.L., Hector E.C.L.. Related [+]
Related: [-] itmeier, Emily
16 16 misc Redacted Document Fri 10/13 11:58 AM
REDACTION to3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Karina R.L.L., Hector E.C.L.. Related [+]
Related: [-] itmeier, Emily
15 15 misc Redacted Document Fri 10/13 11:44 AM
REDACTION of ECF 2 - Administrative Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms by Karina R.L.L., Hector E.C.L.. Related [+]
Related: [-] itmeier, Emily
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 misc Redacted Document Fri 10/13 11:21 AM
REDACTION to1 Complaint, by Karina R.L.L., Hector E.C.L.. Related [+]
Related: [-] itmeier, Emily
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Thursday, October 12, 2023
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Thu 10/12 2:28 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 11 Administrative Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
12 12 misc Refund Status Wed 10/04 5:28 PM
Refund Status re7 Summons Issued as to USA Approved. (rgh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
11 11 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Tue 10/03 8:39 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonyms re1 Complaint, filed by Henrry E.C.L., Karen R.L.L.. Responses due by 10/10/2023. Related [+]
Related: [-] itmeier, Emily
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 respm Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Tue 10/03 8:09 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms Related [+]
Related: [-] itmeier, Emily
Friday, September 29, 2023
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/29 11:09 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Henrry E.C.L., Karen R.L.L... Related [+]
Related: [-] itmeier, Emily
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
8 8 misc Application for Refund Wed 09/27 4:45 PM
Application for Refund, Receipt Number ACANDC-18655455 Amended Application For Refund by Henrry E.C.L., Karen R.L.L.. Related [+]
Related: [-] itmeier, Emily
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 09/19 12:03 PM
Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Proposed Summons Tue 09/19 11:33 AM
Proposed Summons. Related [+]
Related: [-] itmeier, Emily
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 09/19 9:30 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/19 8:36 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/3/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 09/18 6:37 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Henrry E.C.L., Karen R.L.L. re1 Complaint Related [+]
Related: [-] itmeier, Emily
2 2 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Mon 09/18 6:29 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Proceed Under Pseudonyms re1 Complaint filed by Henrry E.C.L., Karen R.L.L.. Responses due by 9/22/2023. Related [+]
Related: [-] itmeier, Emily
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/18 5:58 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18655488.). Filed byKaren R.L.L., Henrry E.C.L.. Related [+]
Related: [-] itmeier, Emily
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 09/19 9:22 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Proposed Summons. The summons should NOT be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The correct event can be found at Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Proposed Summons. Please re-file the SUMMONS ONLY in its entirety. Re:[1-1] Summons filed by Henrry E.C.L., Karen R.L.L. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]