Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steve C Jones
Referred: J Elizabeth Mcbath
Case #: 1:23-cv-04135
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 et seq. Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Cobb County, Georgia
Represented By
Lauren S. Bruce
Cobb County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Hugh William Rowling, Jr.
Office Of Cobb County Attorney
contact info
Mark Alan Adelman
Office Of Cobb County Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Williams Hutchinson
Represented By
Matthew C. Billips
Barrett & Farahany
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
87 87 notice Notice of Public Filing Consistent with Order on Motion to Seal Thu 05/01 3:06 PM
NOTICE Of Public Filing Consistent with Order On Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal of Defendants' Notice of Filing Court-Ordered Documents of Public Docket by Cobb County, Georgia re83 Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal,,,,,,,(Adelman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Plaintiff Williams Hutchinson's Pre-Employment Psychological Evaluation with pages 2-6 redacted,
Att: 2 Plaintiff Williams Hutchinson's Deposition with lines redacted as ordered,
Att: 3 Dr. Kimberly Adams' deposition with lines redacted as ordered
86 86 notice Notice of Court Ordered Sealed Filing Thu 05/01 2:53 PM
Notice of Court Ordered Sealed Filing of Notice of Filing Court-Ordered Sealed Documents by Cobb County, Georgia re:72 Notice of Filing,58 Deposition,83 Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal,,,,,,,59 Deposition,75 Notice of Filing(Adelman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Plaintiff Williams Hutchinson's Pre-Employment Psychological Evaluation, pages 2-6,
Att: 2 Plaintiff Williams Hutchinson's VA medical records,
Att: 3 Pages 46-49, 76, 78, 82, 90-96, and 105 of Plaintiff Williams Hutchinson's deposition,
Att: 4 Pages 45-46, 69, 71, 107, 116, 128-129, 131, 153, 186-187, and 189 of Dr. Kimberly Adams' deposition
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 04/30 12:24 PM
Submission of80 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply and for One-Page Extension to Page Limit , to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (pdw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
85 85 notice Notice of Public Filing Consistent with Order on Motion to Seal Mon 04/28 1:13 PM
NOTICE Of Public Filing Consistent with Order On Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal of Partially Redacted Copy of Exh. 12 to Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Response by Williams Hutchinson re82 Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal,,66 Notice of Filing,(Stark, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Partially Redacted Copy of Exh. 12 to Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Response
84 84 notice Notice of Court Ordered Sealed Filing Mon 04/28 1:07 PM
Notice of Court Ordered Sealed Filing of Pages 2-6 of Exh. 12 of Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Response by Williams Hutchinson re:82 Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal,,66 Notice of Filing,(Stark, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pages 2-6 of Exh. 12 of Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Response
83 83 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal Mon 04/28 11:23 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part76 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Defendant is ORDERED, within three days of this Order, to comply with the following instructions: Re-file pages two through six of Plaintiff's preemployment psychological evaluation, (Doc. 72-1), and Plaintiff's VA medical records, (Docs. 72-2 and 75-1), UNDER SEAL. Re-file Plaintiff's preemployment psychological evaluation, (Doc. 72-1), with only pages two through six redacted, on the public docket. Re-file pages 46-49, 76, 78, 82, 90-96, and 105 of Plaintiff's deposition UNDER SEAL. Re-file Plaintiff's deposition on the public docket with the following lines redacted: Page 46, lines 14-25; Page 47, lines 2-14; Page 48, lines 22-25; Page 49, lines 5-6; Page 76, line 16; Page 78, lines 1-22; Page 82, lines 2-12, 15-16, 19; Page 90, lines 19-20, 23, 25; Page 91, lines 1-2, 5, 12, 18-20, 24; Page 92, lines 5-9, 13-14, 17, 25; Page 93, line 24; Page 94, line 24; Page 95, lines 12-15; Page 96, lines 1-3, 17-18, 20; and Page 105, line 16. Re-file pages 45-46, 69, 71, 107, 116, 128-29, 131, 153, 186-87, and 189 of Dr. Adams' deposition UNDER SEAL. Re-file Dr. Adams' deposition on the public docket with the following lines redacted: Page 45, lines 16-25; Page 46, lines 1-5, 7-10; Page 69, lines 9-17, 19-22; Page 71, lines 12-15; Page 107, line 22; Page 116, line 10; Page 128, lines 23-25; Page 129, lines 1-2, 24-25; Page 131, lines 10-14, 21-22; Page 153, lines 13-19; Page 186, line 25; Page 187, lines 1-15; and Page 189, lines 12, 15. The Court directs Defendant to the relevant instructions on the Court's website: https://www.gand.uscourts.gov/re-filing-sealed-instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 4/28/2025. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
82 82 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal Fri 04/25 12:11 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part67 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Plaintiff is ORDERED, within three days of this Order, to comply with the following instructions: Re-file pages two through six of Exhibit 12 to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, (Doc. 66-1), UNDER SEAL; Re-file Exhibit 12 to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, (Doc. 66-1), with only pages two through six redacted, on the public docket. The Court directs Plaintiff to the relevant instructions on the Court's website: https://www.gand.uscourts.gov/re-filing-sealed-instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 4/25/2025. (rsg)
Related: [-]