Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Gretchen S Lund
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:23-cv-00397
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:Mar 19, 2025
Case in other court:Allen Superior 3, 02D03-2308-PL-000365
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 5:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Federal Express Corporation
Represented By
Pamela A Paige
Plunkett Cooney Pc - Ind/in
contact info
Patrick H Morris PHV
Federal Express Corporation
contact info
Brandon D Pettes PHV
Federal Express Corporation
contact info
Mediator
Anthony Stites
Plaintiff
Breon Wilkins
Represented By
Nathaniel O Hubley
Theisen Hubley Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
45 45 misc Costs Taxed - form will be generated Tue 04/15 10:26 AM
Pursuant to *44 Notice that Costs will be Taxed by Clerk *, Costs are hereby taxed in the amount of $ *4,391.60* against *Breon Wilkins*. (rmf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
44 44 notice Notice that Costs will be Taxed by Clerk - form will be generated Tue 04/01 11:41 AM
Pursuant to *43 Bill of Costs filed by Federal Express Corporation *, costs in the amount of $ *4,391.60* will be taxed by the Clerk on *4/15/2025*. (rmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
43 43 misc Bill of Costs Mon 03/31 1:03 PM
BILL OF COSTS by Federal Express Corporation.(Pettes PHV, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, March 20, 2025
42 42 misc Clerks Judgment Thu 03/20 8:43 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (ely)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
41 41 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Thu 03/20 8:42 AM
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment DE25 . The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter judgment against Plaintiff and in favor of the Defendant. The Plaintiff takes nothing by his Complaint. Signed by Judge Gretchen S Lund on 3/19/2025. (ely)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
40 40 notice Notice - Other Wed 10/30 4:12 PM
NOTICE by Federal Express Corporation re35 Reply to Response to Motion -- NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED EXHIBIT 2 --(Pettes PHV, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 2 - Supplemental Declaration of Caleb Brandt
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
39 39 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 10/29 3:51 PM
MOTION HEARING held on 10/29/2024 on Defendant's25 MOTION for Summary Judgment before Judge Gretchen S Lund. Pla appeared by atty Nathaniel Hubley. Dft appeared by atty Brandon Pettes. Arguments heard. Exhibit 2 of DE35 is sealed on request of the parties, dft will file redacted version. Court will take the matter under advisement and issue a written order within the next 90 days. (Court Reporter Ashley Stokes.) (jss)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
38 38 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Tue 09/24 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion25 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing is SET for 10/29/2024 at 01:30 PM (CDT) in US District Court - Hammond before Judge Gretchen S Lund. (jss)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
37 37 misc Response/Reply Mon 09/23 3:53 PM
*DOCKETED IN ERROR, DISREGARD ENTRY* REPLY by Federal Express Corporation to32 Response to Motion PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT .(Paige, Pamela) Modified on 9/23/2024 to relfect docketing error (sej)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
36 36 misc Response/Reply Mon 09/23 3:38 PM
RESPONSE by Federal Express Corporation to33 Response to Motion PLAINTIFF'S ADDITIONAL STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS . (Paige, Pamela)
Related: [-]
35 35 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 09/23 3:22 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Express Corporation.(Paige, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Thursday, August 29, 2024
34 34 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 08/29 3:59 PM
Plaintiff's Appendix to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Breon Wilkins.(Hubley, Nathaniel) Modified on 8/29/2024 (jss)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Declaration of Hatcher,
Att: 2 Appendix Declaration of Piekarski,
Att: 3 Appendix Declaration of Saffold,
Att: 4 Appendix Declaration of Wilkins,
Att: 5 Appendix Declaration of Mendez
33 33 respm Response to Motion Thu 08/29 3:56 PM
RESPONSE to Statement of Material Facts and Plaintiff's Additional Statement of Material Facts filed by Breon Wilkins. (Hubley, Nathaniel) Modified on 8/29/2024 (jss)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Response to Motion Thu 08/29 3:54 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment Brief in Opposition to MSJ filed by Breon Wilkins. (Hubley, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
31 31 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 08/12 2:31 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the30 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. Response to be filed by 9/24/2024. Text entry by Judge Gretchen S Lund on 8/12/2024. (jss)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 08/12 2:27 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Response to FedEx's Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Federal Express Corporation. (Paige, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
29 29 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 07/30 9:59 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS28 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Response to be filed by 8/29/2024 Text entry by Judge Gretchen S Lund on 7/30/2024. (jss)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 07/29 2:45 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to25 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Breon Wilkins. (Hubley, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
27 27 respm Statement Thu 07/11 1:14 PM
STATEMENT of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Express Corporation.(Paige, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Deposition with Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Caleb Brandt,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Bill,
Att: 4 Exhibit Declaration of Bridget Zaborski
26 26 15 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Thu 07/11 1:07 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Express Corporation. (Paige, Pamela)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Summary Judgment Thu 07/11 1:01 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Federal Express Corporation. (Paige, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
24 24 notice Bright Line Notice Fri 06/14 10:14 AM
NOTICE: Because the discovery period in this case has now concluded and there are no pending non-dispositive motions, the referral to Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins is now terminated. All further matters will now be handled by Judge Gretchen S Lund unless otherwise directed. This entry constitutes the court's order on this matter and shall carry the same weight and authority as a written order signed by the judge. (mr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
23 23 3 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 03/25 6:56 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Gretchen S Lund for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Holly A Brady no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 3/25/24. (ksc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 11/20 3:51 PM
ORDER GRANTING, APPROVING AND ADOPTING21 Joint Motion for Order Under Federal Rule of Evidence 502 by Defendant Federal Express Corporation, to the extent set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 11/20/2023. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
21 21 motion Protective Order Thu 11/09 4:01 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Federal Express Corporation.(Pettes PHV, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
20 20 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 11/08 3:28 PM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS the parties to RE-FILE the proposed order, this time accompanying it with a motion. The parties are AFFORDED until on or before 11/15/2023, to file their motion, with the proposed order as an exhibit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 11/8/2023. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
19 19 4 pgs order Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/24 7:33 AM
ORDER granting13 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Patrick H Morris PHV for Federal Express Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/23/2023. (ace)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
18 18 order Scheduling Order Fri 10/20 3:24 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 11/30/2023. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 06/07/2024. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 04/05/2024; and from Defendant by 05/03/2024. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 11/20/2023; as to Defendant is 12/11/2023. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 07/12/2024, with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with Local Rule 56-1(b) and (c). The parties have agreed upon Anthony Stites as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/20/2023. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
17 17 minutes Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs Thu 10/19 1:02 PM
TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/19/2023 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Nathaniel Hubley. Dft appeared by atty Bandon Pettes. The14 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Hubley to notify Mediator by letter, copy to atty Pettes. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/9/2023. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
16 16 order Order Wed 10/18 1:59 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The15 Proposed Joint Fed. R. Evid. 502 Order is hereby STRICKEN as proposed orders are not to be filed as separate docket entries. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
15 15 misc Proposed Pretrial Order Tue 10/17 11:37 AM
Proposed Pretrial Order Joint Fed. R. Evid. 502 Order by Federal Express Corporation. (Paige, Pamela)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Tue 10/17 11:28 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Paige, Pamela)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/17 11:14 AM
Application for Attorney Patrick H. Morris to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Federal Express Corporation. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5385801(Morris, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit TN Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, October 16, 2023
12 12 6 pgs order Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/17 7:15 AM
ORDER granting11 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brandon D Pettes PHV for Federal Express Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/16/2023. (ace)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
11 11 motion Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/12 2:25 PM
Application for Attorney Brandon D. Pettes to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Federal Express Corporation. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5381440(Paige, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/25 11:33 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Federal Express Corporation.(Paige, Pamela)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Mon 09/25 9:48 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Mon 09/25 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2023 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call using telephone numbers appearing on the docket. Cell phones are not permitted.(mr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/21 2:59 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Express Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Federal Express Corporation d/b/a FedEx Express, Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for Federal Express Corporation.. (Paige, Pamela)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 09/21 11:12 AM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Defendant is directed to file an Amended Disclosure Statement that complies with General Order 2023-06 on or before 9/27/2023. The5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed on 9/19/2023 is deficient. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 09/19 10:34 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Express Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Federal Express Corporation d/b/a FedEx Express, Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for Federal Express Corporation.. (Paige, Pamela)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 09/19 7:42 AM
**NEW CASE** Chief Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/18 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela A Paige on behalf of Federal Express Corporation (Paige, Pamela)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 09/18 3:30 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5357090.) from Allen County Superior, Cause No. 02D03-2308-PL-000365, filed by Federal Express Corporation.(Paige, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Record (Complaint, Jury Trial Demand, Appearance, Order, Summons, Initial Hearing),
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
4 4 misc Jury Demand Tue 09/19 7:41 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Breon Wilkins in Allen Superior Court 02D03-2308-PL-000365. (kmt)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp State Court Complaint Tue 09/19 7:40 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Federal Express Corporation, filed by Breon Wilkins in Allen Superior Court 02D03-2308-PL-000365.(kmt)
Related: [-]