Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Gretchen S Lund
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:23-cv-00398
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:1 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 5:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Shawn Gengerke
Defendant
S7 IP Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff
Davaus, LLC
Represented By
Benjamin D Ice
Barrett Mcnagny LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
69 69 12 pgs order Opinion and Order Order Transferring Case to Other District Wed 03/05 3:24 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant's motion is GRANTED19 . The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the District of South Dakota, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1406(a), and close the case in this district. Signed by Judge Gretchen S Lund on 03/05/2025. (jdb)
Related: [-]