Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Michael G Gotsch, Sr
Case #: 3:23-cv-00851
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:May 13, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 5:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Forest River, Inc.
900 CR 1 N
Elkhart, IN 46514
Represented By
Thomas Jackson Bemenderfer
Taft Stettinius & Hollister Llp - Ind/in
contact info
John D Papageorge
Taft Stettinius & Hollister Llp - Ind/in
contact info
Thomas J Bemenderfer
Taft Stettinius & Hollister Llp - Ind/in
contact info
Mediator
Pete Schroeder
Plaintiff
Adam Lacoste
Represented By
Richard C Dalton
Richard C Dalton LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Markie Lacoste
Represented By
Richard C Dalton
Richard C Dalton LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, May 13, 2024
16 16 order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Terminate Civil Case Mon 05/13 12:08 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to15 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss. Parties to bear their own fees and costs. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 5/13/24. (dnj)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
15 15 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Fri 05/10 1:16 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Defendant Forest River, Inc.. (Bemenderfer, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
14 14 minutes Settlement Conference Mon 03/25 9:10 AM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 3/21/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr. Pla Markie & Adam Lacoste appeared with Atty Rick Dalton. Dft atty Forest River Related [+] Dan Evans; and Kyle Hilliard appeared with Atty Tom Bemenderfer. Parties appeared for JSC, negotiated in good faith, and reached a comprehensive settlement agreement. Dismissal Papers due by 5/10/2024. (slm) Modified on 3/25/2024 (slm)
Related: [-] ps
Friday, March 08, 2024
13 13 minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 03/08 11:47 AM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 3/8/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr. Pla appeared by atty Dalton. Dft appeared by atty Bemenderfer. Confidential Settlement Report due by 3/11/2024. Settlement Conference set for 3/21/2024 10:00 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr. (slm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Thu 03/07 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Hearings: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set, to establish dates for a judicial settlement conference, for 3/8/2024 11:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr. To connect to the conference, parties should dial 833-568-8864, enter meeting ID number 160 4237 7854#, push # to skip entry of a participant ID and enter passcode 356255# at least five minutes before the conference start time.(slm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 01/30 2:56 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Any motion challenging Plaintiff's jurisdictional allegations shall be filed on or before 03/29/2024. The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 03/07/2024. The last date for the parties to amend the pleadings without leave of court is 03/25/2024. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff(s) by 07/25/2024; and from defendant(s) by 09/25/2024. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) is due every six weeks until trial. The last date for the completion of ALL DISCOVERY is 01/27/2025. The deadline to file any discovery-related nondispositive motion is 12/30/2024. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 02/26/2025, with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with N.D. Ind. L.R. 56-1(b)-(c). The parties have agreed to Pete Schroeder as mediator. The parties are authorized to mediate until 02/14/2025. The Court hereby VACATES the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for February 13, 2024, at 10:45 a.m. EST. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 01/30/2024. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
10 10 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Thu 01/25 5:33 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bemenderfer, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
9 9 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Fri 01/05 10:42 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/05 10:42 AM
ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 1/25/2024. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2024 10:45 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/5/24. (slm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/04 5:40 PM
Forest River's ANSWER to1 Complaint , Affirmative and Other Defenses by Forest River, Inc..(Bemenderfer, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/23 5:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Forest River, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Forest River, Inc... (Bemenderfer, Thomas)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 10/23 5:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Forest River, Inc.. Forest River, Inc. waiver sent on 10/3/2023, answer due 12/4/2023. (Bemenderfer, Thomas)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/23 5:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John D Papageorge on behalf of Forest River, Inc. (Papageorge, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/23 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Jackson Bemenderfer on behalf of Forest River, Inc. (Bemenderfer, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 09/19 2:09 PM
Summons Issued as to Forest River, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 09/19 2:08 PM
Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE. (nal)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/18 3:58 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Forest River, Inc.( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5357161.), filed by Markie Lacoste, Adam Lacoste.(Dalton, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons