Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Michael G Gotsch, Sr
Case #: 3:23-cv-00852
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:Feb 05, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 5:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Grand Design RV, LLC
Plaintiff
John L. Kennedy
Represented By
Richard C Dalton
Richard C Dalton LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Chantelle Kennedy
Represented By
Richard C Dalton
Richard C Dalton LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, February 05, 2024
6 6 order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Terminate Civil Case Mon 02/05 10:46 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 2/5/24. (dnj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
5 5 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Tue 01/30 3:57 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs John L. Kennedy, Chantelle Kennedy. (Dalton, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
4 4 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 12/28 10:57 AM
ORDER: Having received the3 Notice of Settlement, the court ORDERS Dismissal Papers to be filed by 2/21/24. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 12/28/23. (dnj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 12/21 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by John L. Kennedy, Chantelle Kennedy (Dalton, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 09/19 9:18 AM
Summons Issued as to Grand Design RV, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ash)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 09/19 9:15 AM
Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. **NEW CASE** (ash)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/18 4:31 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Grand Design RV, LLC( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5357230.), filed by John L. Kennedy, Chantelle Kennedy.(Dalton, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons