City of Taunton v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-04655 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Sep 15, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 1:23-cv-11892 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 6:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Ansul Company
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501 |
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
E. I. DuPont De Nemours & Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Protection Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Angus Fire
|
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Plaintiff
City of Taunton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 16, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice between Plaintiffs and Tyco, Chemguard, ChemDesign, and Released Parties by Tyco Fire Products LP.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, May 15, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by BASF Corp.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.). Associated Cases)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 09/18 11:36 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Massachusetts (associated as of 9/15/2023), 1:23-cv-11892, City of Taunton v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-04655-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:23-cv-11892. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
10 | 10 Case transferred to the District of South Carolina pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 9/14/2023. Case file electronically extracted to the Clerk in that district. (Belpedio, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/18/2023.] | |
Thursday, September 14, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard's5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleadings. (Pacho, Arnold) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/18/2023.] | |
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Friday, August 18, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Quilter, Madison) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/18/2023.] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Angel Kelley assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/18/2023.] | |
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |