California Northern District Court
Judge:Trina L Thompson
Case #: 3:23-cv-04696
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2023
Terminated:Feb 16, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 11, 2024 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
District Attorney of California
Defendant
Secretary of State
Plaintiff
Arcelio Joseph Reybol
167 Ben Lomond
Hercules, CA 94547

GPO Dec 15 2023
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF FEDERAL JURISDICTION. Show Cause Response due by 1/16/2024. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/15/2023. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)copy placed in O:drive for mailing on 12/18/2023 Modified on 12/18/2023 (klh, COURT STAFF).

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 16, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Fri 02/16 3:23 PM
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 2/16/2024. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Declination of Default Tue 01/30 9:47 AM
Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT as to all defendants. The docket does not reflect a summons returned executed as to any defendant. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Related [+](wsn, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-] (s)10
Friday, January 19, 2024
11 11 misc Statement Fri 01/19 11:18 AM
Statement by Arcelio Joseph Reybol. (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/18 4:22 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Trina L Thompson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 1/18/24. (as, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 01/18 12:58 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff may file an objection to this Report and Recommendation no later than fourteen days after a copy of it has been served on him. THIS CASE SHALL BE REASSIGNED TO A DISTRICT JUDGE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on January 18, 2024. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) copy placed in O:drive for mailing on 1/18/2024 Modified on 1/18/2024 (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
10 10 motion Entry of Default Fri 01/19 11:17 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Arcelio Joseph Reybol. (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/26 5:31 PM
Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 7(a) by Arcelio Joseph Reybol. (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
7 7 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial Mon 12/18 8:11 AM
Minute Entry for ZOOM proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/15/2023. Order to Show Cause to issue. Mr. Reybol will file a motion for default judgment. Digital Recording Time: Zoom Webinar Time: 2:02-2:17 = 15 M. Attorney for Plaintiff: Arcelio Reybol, pro se. Attorney for Defendants: No Appearance. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2023)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
6 6 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 12/15 4:36 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF FEDERAL JURISDICTION. Show Cause Response due by 1/16/2024. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/15/2023. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Received Document Fri 12/15 2:24 PM
Received Document by Arcelio Joseph Reybol. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
4 4 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Mon 12/04 3:39 PM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (klh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 09/18 8:53 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/18 8:51 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Arcelio Joseph Reybol. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/18 8:50 AM
COMPLAINT against District Attorney of California, Secretary of State (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 311166002). Filed by Arcelio Joseph Reybol. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2023. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Filing fee receipt