California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 4:23-cv-04764
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Dec 15, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:51 AM PDT
Defendant
Salesforce, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey John Zuber
Zuber Lawler LLP
contact info
Brian Joel Beck
Zuber Lawler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dr. Lisbeth W. Roy
Represented By
Courtney L. Stuart-Alban
Arnold & Porter LLP
contact info
Juan Pablo Alban
Stuart Alban Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
27 27 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 12/13 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Lisbeth W. Roy (Alban, Juan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
utility Terminate Motions Thu 11/30 9:50 AM
***19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (lack of subject-matter jurisdiction and failure to state a cause of action) Terminated. Motion was Re-Filed as Docket No.26 not Re-Noticed as Directed to do via Docket No.23 .*** (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
26 26 motion Dismiss Wed 11/29 2:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss (lack of subject matter jurisdiction and failure to state a claim) filed by Salesforce, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 2/15/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. Responses due by 12/13/2023. Replies due by 12/20/2023.(Zuber, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Brian J. Beck,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - EO_20-123,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - EO_20-139,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - EO_20-244,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Doctors Studio homepage, Wayback Machine 20230808,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Doctors Studio current homepage,
Att: 7 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
25 25 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 11/28 5:17 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Alban, Juan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
24 24 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Telephonic Hearing (AT&T) Tue 11/21 1:26 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Telephonic Case Management Conference has been set for December 19, 2023, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by December 12th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:23-cv-04764-HSG. The December 19, 2023 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for a telephonic case management conference are required to dial-in at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/21 12:02 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 11/21/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 11/21 11:15 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/21/2023. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
9 9 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 10/16 8:10 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND TO OPPOSE A RESPONSIVE MOTION; DECL OF COURTNEY STUART-ALBAN filed by Lisbeth W. Roy. (Alban, Juan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/29 11:54 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lisbeth W. Roy.. (Alban, Juan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
7 7 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 09/28 4:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lisbeth W. Roy (Alban, Juan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 09/18 3:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Lisabeth Roy. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 09/18 3:17 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Mon 09/18 12:17 PM
Proposed Summons. (Alban, Juan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 09/18 12:15 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Lisabeth Roy . (Alban, Juan)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 09/18 9:08 AM
Electronic Filing Error. Civil Cover Sheet missing. Randomly assigning case to judge will not take place until Completed Civil Cover has been filed. Please complete Civil Cover Sheet Rev. 10/20 and file as a separate docket entry Re:1 Complaint filed by Lisabeth Roy (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/18 12:19 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/29/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Salesforce.Com.Inc. Filed by Lisabeth Roy. (Alban, Juan) (Filing Fee paid $402.00, Tracking ID CANDC-18648773) Modified text on 9/18/2023, to conform with document posted by counsel. (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/18/2023 (bw, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]