CL 1 et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 4:23-cv-04772 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Sep 15, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:51 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does 1 through 50, inclusive
|
|
Defendant
Raiser, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Raiser-CA, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jane Roe CL 1
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Roe CL 1
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Roe CL 2
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Roe CL 3
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jane Roe CL 1, John Roe CL 1, Jane Roe CL 2, Jane Roe CL 3 as to Raiser-CA, LLC (Cutter, Curtis) |
|
16 | 16
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jane Roe CL 1, John Roe CL 1, Jane Roe CL 2, Jane Roe CL 3 as to Raiser, LLC (Cutter, Curtis) |
|
15 | 15
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jane Roe CL 1, John Roe CL 1, Jane Roe CL 2, Jane Roe CL 3 as to Uber Technologies, Inc. (Cutter, Curtis) |
|
14 | 14
![]() ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/23/2023. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Mon 10/23 4:14 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101] These filings will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in their entirety. Re:15 Certificate of Service,17 Certificate of Service,16 Certificate of Service. Correct CM/ECF event is, Summons Returned Executed. (wsn, COURT STAFF) |
||
utility
MDL Member Case
Mon 10/23 4:15 PM
MEMBER CASE MDL 3084: 3:23-cv-04772-CRB CL 1 et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al pursuant to Order Relating Cases (Docket 22 in 23-md-3084-CRB) cc: JPMDL (wsn, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, October 20, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Re 3:23-md-03084-CRB. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/20/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) |
|
12 | 12
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Fri 10/20 8:46 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO.7 . Notice is hereby given that counsel must notice the motion for hearing. The briefing schedule remains in effect. The motion should not be re-filed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) |
|
11 | 11
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Telephonic Hearing (AT&T)
Fri 10/20 8:34 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Telephonic Case Management Conference has been set for December 19, 2023, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by December 12th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:23-cv-04772-HSG. The December 19, 2023 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for a telephonic case management conference are required to dial-in at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 10/19/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF) |
|
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Thu 10/19 8:10 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jane Roe CL 1, John Roe CL 1, Jane Roe CL 2, Jane Roe CL 3.. (Cutter, Curtis) |
|
7 | 7
![]() MOTION for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously filed by Jane Roe CL 1, John Roe CL 1, Jane Roe CL 2, Jane Roe CL 3. Responses due by 11/1/2023. Replies due by 11/8/2023.(Cutter, Curtis) Modified on 10/19/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, October 05, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/19/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (anj, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued as to Raiser, LLC, Raiser-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (anj, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 09/18 8:57 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Mon 09/18 12:54 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . A motion and proposed order to proceed anonymously must be filed. Re: 1 Complaint, filed by Jane Roe CL 3, Jane Roe CL 1, Jane Roe CL 2, John Roe CL 1 (anj, COURT STAFF) |
||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Mon 09/18 1:02 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Celine E. Cutter- The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document. Please update your personal profile on ECF. Re: 1 Complaint, filed by Jane Roe CL 3, Jane Roe CL 1, Jane Roe CL 2, John Roe CL 1 (anj, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |