California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 4:23-cv-04773
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2023
Terminated:Sep 20, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:52 AM PDT
Defendant
Plex, Inc.
Plaintiff
Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC
Represented By
Randall Garteiser
Garteiser Honea, PLLC
contact info
Christopher Alan Honea
Garteiser Honea PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 09/20 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC (Garteiser, Randall)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 09/20 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC (Garteiser, Randall)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Wed 09/20 2:20 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Duplicate entry. [err103] Re:9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
7 7 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 09/18 10:10 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 09/18 9:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Plex, Inc.. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 09/18 9:40 AM
ERRONEOUS ENTRY - DISREGARD. FILING ERROR. SEE DOCKET 6 . Summons Issued as to Plex, Inc. (krp, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/18/2023 (krp, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/18 8:46 AM
Case assigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
3 3 Proposed Summons. (Garteiser, Randall)
Related: [-]
2 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark (AO 120). (cc: form mailed to register). (Garteiser, Randall)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Plex, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BCANDC-18650266.). Filed byRothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC.(Garteiser, Randall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Patent,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Claim Charts