Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Gretchen S Lund
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:23-cv-00399
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 5:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Dekalb Eastern Community School District
300 E. Washington St.
Butler, IN 46271
Represented By
Elizabeth J Sommers
Coots Henke & Wheeler PC
contact info
Matthew L Hinkle
Coots Henke & Wheeler PC
contact info
Lakisha S Woods
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Laura Parks
Coots Henke & Wheeler PC
contact info
Mark D Scudder
Barnes & Thornburg Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Mediator
David Henn
Henn Mediation LLC 1634 West Smith Valley Road Suite B
Greenwood, IN 46142
Plaintiff
B B
Represented By
Alexandra M Curlin
Curlin & Clay Law
contact info
Plaintiff
S B
Represented By
Alexandra M Curlin
Curlin & Clay Law
contact info
Plaintiff
W B
Represented By
Alexandra M Curlin
Curlin & Clay Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, February 20, 2025
utility Dismissal Notice to Parties Pursuant to Rule 41a1 Thu 02/20 10:00 AM
CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the25 Stipulation of Dismissal. (jss)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
25 25 motion Dismiss Wed 02/19 4:13 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Stipulation of Dismissal by Plaintiffs W B, S B, B B. (Curlin, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 02/17 4:51 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Papers by Defendant Dekalb Eastern Community School District. (Parks, Laura)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
23 23 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 02/11 11:00 AM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins: Dft's22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Papers is granted. Dismissal papers to be filed by 2/17/2025. Text entry order. (ash)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 02/03 4:58 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Papers by Defendant Dekalb Eastern Community School District. (Parks, Laura)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
21 21 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 01/03 3:18 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Pursuant to the filing of the20 Notice of Settlement, parties are to file dismissal papers on or before 2/3/2025. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 12/30 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Dekalb Eastern Community School District (Parks, Laura)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 09/06 12:04 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Dft's18 Motion to Extend Case Deadlines is granted. All fact and expert discovery due by 12/4/2024 and dispositive motions to be filed by 12/30/2024. Text entry order. (ash)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 09/05 2:34 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Extend Case Deadlines by Defendant Dekalb Eastern Community School District. (Parks, Laura)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
17 17 3 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 03/25 6:56 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Gretchen S Lund for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Holly A Brady no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 3/25/24. (ksc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
16 16 notice Notice - Other Mon 01/15 4:45 PM
NOTICE by Dekalb Eastern Community School District and Plaintiffs of Selection of Mediator (Parks, Laura)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
15 15 order Scheduling Order Wed 11/15 3:37 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 12/20/2023. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 9/5/2024. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiffs by 5/15/2024; and from Defendant by 6/30/2024. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiffs is 2/3/2024; as to Defendant is 3/2/2024. Except as otherwise noted, the deadlines in this Order may be modified only for good cause and with the judges consent pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4). The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 10/1/2024. Parties shall name a mediator no later than 1/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 11/15/2023. (mrm)
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs Wed 11/15 10:25 AM
TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/15/2023 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla's appeared by atty Alexandra Curlin. Dft appeared by attys Mark Scudder and Laura Parks. The13 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Parties are to file a notice with the Court by 1/15/2023 advising of their selection of a Mediator. Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/6/2023. (FTR 1st Floor.) (Tape #FTR 1st Floor.) (ash)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
13 13 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Fri 11/10 5:19 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Parks, Laura)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/08 5:25 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Dekalb Eastern Community School District.(Hinkle, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/06 2:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Parks on behalf of Dekalb Eastern Community School District (Parks, Laura)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/16 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J Sommers on behalf of Dekalb Eastern Community School District (Sommers, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/16 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L Hinkle on behalf of Dekalb Eastern Community School District (Hinkle, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
8 8 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Thu 10/12 9:53 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Thu 10/12 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call using telephone numbers appearing on the docket. Cell phones are not permitted. (mr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 10/11 4:43 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Defendant Dekalb Eastern Community School District. (Woods, Lakisha)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/11 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lakisha S Woods on behalf of Dekalb Eastern Community School District (Woods, Lakisha)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/11 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D Scudder on behalf of Dekalb Eastern Community School District (Scudder, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 09/20 9:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Dekalb Eastern Community School District. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ash)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 09/20 9:41 AM
Chief Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. **NEW CASE** (ash)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/19 11:17 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M Curlin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Curlin, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/19 11:11 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Dekalb Eastern Community School District( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5357785.), filed by W B, B B, S B.(Curlin, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet