California Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas S Hixson
Case #: 3:23-cv-04801
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Jan 11, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 2:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Danh Dinh Nguyen
1495 Hays Street
San Leandro, CA 94577
Plaintiff
David Robinson
Represented By
Richard J. Morin
Law Office Of Rick Morin, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 11, 2024
11 11 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Thu 01/11 9:17 AM
STIPULATION for dismissal of entire case with prejudice filed by David Robinson. (Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
10 10 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 10/27 4:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Danh Dinh Nguyen re9 Answer to Complaint (jlm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/25 2:08 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Danh Dinh Nguyen. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 10/16 9:26 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Robinson. Danh Dinh Nguyen served on 10/14/2023, answer due 11/6/2023. (Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/22 9:25 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Robinson.. (Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case Tue 09/19 10:43 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 09/19 10:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Danh Dinh Nguyen. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/19 10:22 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/3/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 09/19 9:28 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by David Robinson (Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 09/19 9:27 AM
Proposed Summons. (Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/19 9:24 AM
COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Danh Dinh Nguyen ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18656380.). Filed byDavid Robinson.(Morin, Richard) Modified on 9/19/2023 (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet