Nevada District Court
Judge:Richard F Boulware, II
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:23-cv-01459
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 2:52 AM PDT
Defendant
Robert Estes
Defendant
Tiffany Josephs
Defendant
Wright Noel
Defendant
Thomas Stockard
Plaintiff
Jonathan Taylor
1269351 High Desert State Prison PO Box 650
Indian Springs, NV 89070
Represented By
Law Library - High Desert State Prison
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
29 29 misc Mail Returned Tue 03/04 2:36 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable (not @ HDSP) re28 Report and Recommendation, addressed to Jonathan Taylor. (GA)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
28 28 motion Report and Recommendation Tue 03/04 11:03 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's address update deadline. Objections to R&R due by 3/17/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/3/2025. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
27 27 misc Mail Returned Tue 01/14 7:28 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Not at HDSP) re 26 Minute Order, addressed to Jonathan Taylor. (GA)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
26 26 minord Minute Order Mon 01/13 2:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/13/2025. Pursuant to Local Rule IA 3-1, Plaintiff must update his address by 2/12/2025. (no image attached) ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ANS)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
25 25 misc Mail Returned Fri 01/10 2:12 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Offender is not at HDSP) re24 Amended Complaint addressed to Jonathan Taylor. (GA)
Related: [-]
24 24 cmp Complaint Amended Fri 01/10 8:51 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Tiffany Josephs, Wright Noel, James Dzurenda, Julie Williams, William Kulolia by Jonathan Taylor. Adds and removes parties. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
23 23 minord Minute Order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Thu 01/02 11:45 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/2/2025. Having reviewed Plaintiff's 22 Motion to Extend Time and good cause being found, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until February 2, 2025, to file an amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is instructed to provide Plaintiff a physical courtesy copy of this order by first-class U.S. postage. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HBG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
22 22 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Mon 12/30 11:43 AM
MOTION to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Jonathan Taylor. Responses due by 1/9/2025. (DRM) (amend)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
21 21 misc Objection Report and Recommendation Thu 12/12 7:47 AM
OBJECTION to18 Report and Recommendation, by Plaintiff Jonathan Taylor. Response to Objections to R&R due by 12/26/2024. (DRM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
20 20 minord Minute Order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Tue 11/26 10:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/26/2024. Having reviewed Plaintiff's 19 Motion to Extend Time and good cause being found, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until December 11, 2024, to file objections to the 18 report and recommendation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until December 23, 2024 to file an amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is instructed to provide Plaintiff a physical courtesy copy of this order by first-class U.S. postage. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HBG)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Tue 11/26 9:23 AM
MOTION to Extend Time by Plaintiff Jonathan Taylor. Responses due by 12/10/2024. (DLS) (objectrr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
18 18 motion Report and Recommendation Order Wed 11/13 11:20 AM
ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Defendants Wright Noel and Robert Estes be dismissed with prejudice as these Defendants are immune from suit. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to file an amended complaint, he must do so by December 9, 2024 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is to mail a copy of the non-prisoner, pro se form complaint for civil rights violations to the Plaintiff. (Mailed 11/13/2024). Objections to R&R due by 11/27/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/13/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
17 17 minord Minute Order Fri 10/18 10:07 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/18/2024. The Court's prior order at ECF No. 16 was entered in error. As such, the Clerk of Court is directed to STRIKE ECF No. 16. (no image attached) ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ANS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
16 16 minord Minute Order Thu 10/17 11:53 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/17/2024. The Early Neutral Evaluation presently scheduled for 12/20/2024 is continued in time only to 11:00 AM. (no image attached) ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ANS)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
15 15 cmp Complaint Amended Fri 05/03 10:01 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Robert Estes, Tiffany Josephs, Wright Noel by Jonathan Taylor. Removes parties. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
minord Minute Order Order on Report and Recommendation Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Fri 04/05 8:11 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/5/2024. On March 22, 2024, the Court recommended that Plaintiff's case be dismissed for failure to amend his complaint by the deadline. ECF No. 10. Plaintiff filed a Motion to Extend Time to File an Amended Complaint and filed objections to the Court's Report and Recommendation. ECF Nos. 12 and 13. The Court construes each as a motion for reconsideration of its Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 10) that recommended dismissal. Plaintiff has demonstrated good cause and excusable neglect to warrant extending the amended complaint deadline. As such, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's12 Motion to Extend and finds as moot its10 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint by May 6, 2024. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ANS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
13 13 misc Objection Report and Recommendation Tue 04/02 8:55 AM
OBJECTION to ECF No.10 Report and Recommendation, by Plaintiff Jonathan Taylor. Response to Objections to R&R due by 4/16/2024. (DLS)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Tue 04/02 8:53 AM
MOTION to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint Related [+], by Plaintiff Jonathan Taylor. Responses due by 4/16/2024. (DLS) (amend)
Related: [-] ECF No.4 Order
Friday, March 22, 2024
11 11 appeal USCA Mandate Mon 03/25 2:14 PM
MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to9 USCA Order dismissing judgment of the USCA, as to 7 Appeal Case Number Assigned filed by Jonathan Taylor. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Report and Recommendation Mon 03/25 10:06 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Court advised Plaintiff that if he did not file an amended complaint by this date, the Court would recommend that this case be dismissed. Since this order, Plaintiff has not filed anything in his case. Accordingly, he appears to have abandoned his case. IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs case be dismissed without prejudice and this case be closed. Objections to R&R due by 4/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/22/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
9 9 appeal USCA Order Fri 03/01 3:49 PM
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, DISMISSING6 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jonathan Taylor. This appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. USCA Case Number 23-4112 . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
8 8 appeal USCA Order Time Schedule Tue 12/12 3:05 PM
USCA ORDER for Time Schedule as to6 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jonathan Taylor. USCA Case Number 23-4112 . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
6 6 appeal Notice Appeal Tue 12/12 9:34 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to ECF No.4 Order, by Plaintiff Jonathan Taylor. Filing fee NOT paid. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (PACER Docket Sheet ATTACHED hereto for distribution to P via HDSP Law Library). (GA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of Pacer Docket Sheet
appeal Appeal Case Number Assigned Tue 12/12 2:57 PM
USCA, Ninth Circuit Appellate Case Number 23-4112 assigned to6 Notice of Appeal. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
5 5 cmp Complaint Thu 11/30 3:25 PM
COMPLAINT, filed per4 Order, against Robert Estes, Tiffany Josephs, Wright Noel, Thomas Stockard by Jonathan Taylor. (RGDG)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Report and Recommendation Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines) Thu 11/30 3:21 PM
ORDER Granting3 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court must detach and separately file Plaintiff's complaint (ECF No. 1 -1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Defendants Wright Noel, Thomas Stockard, and Robert Estes be dismissed with prejudice as the allegations involving these Defendants do not give rise to a First Amendment claim for denial of access to the courts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to file an amended complaint, he must do so by January 3, 2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is to mail a copy of the nonprisoner, pro se form complaint for civil rights violations to the Plaintiff. Objections to R&R due by 12/14/2023. Amended Complaint deadline: 1/3/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/30/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF. Non-Prisoner Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights ATTACHED hereto for distribution to Plaintiff via Law Library - High Desert State Prison. - RGDG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Non-Prisoner Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
3 3 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 11/21 8:35 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jonathan Taylor. (DRM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Tue 09/19 8:13 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Receipt Initiating Documents Tue 09/19 8:10 AM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (DRM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint