California Northern District Court
Judge:Alex G Tse
Referred: Pslc Mwd
Case #: 3:23-cv-04797
Nature of Suit540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
10 10 misc Letter Thu 10/12 8:09 PM
Letter dated 10/4/2023 from Scott Barnes. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, October 06, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 10/06 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Scott Edward Barnes(ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
8 8 misc Letter Thu 10/05 3:45 PM
Letter from Scott Edward Barnes. (ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 10/05 3:43 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Edward Barnes. (ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP Thu 10/05 3:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Scott Edward Barnes. (ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Complaint Thu 10/05 3:40 PM
COMPLAINT by a Prisoner Under the Civil Rights Act 42 USC 1983. Filed byScott Edward Barnes. Consent/Declination due by 10/18/2023. (ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
4 4 oth_evt Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 09/20 2:10 PM
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (ecg, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: IFP Wed 09/20 2:09 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/27/2023. (ecg, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_evt Clerk's Notice to File Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint/Habeas Petition on Form Wed 09/20 2:07 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Petition on Form due by 10/27/2023. (ecg, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/19 10:34 AM
COMPLAINT LETTER - Filed by Scott Edward Barns. Consent/Declination due by 10/3/2023.(kmg, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/19/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope