California Northern District Court
Judge:Trina L Thompson
Case #: 5:23-cv-04803
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1126 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Oct 13, 2023
Case in other court:Texas Western, 6:23-cv-00051
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 2:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Google LLC
Represented By
Brian Christopher Banner
Slayden Grubert Beard PLLC
contact info
Nathaniel Legum
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Bill Trac
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Luann L. Simmons
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Darin W Snyder
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Mark Liang
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Darin Walter Snyder
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Flick Intelligence, LLC
Represented By
Susan S.Q. Kalra
Ramey LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Eugene Kubiak
Ramey LLP
contact info
William P. Ramey, III
Ramey & Schwaller, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
55 55 CLERKS NOTICE - REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Trina L. Thompson upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Thompson's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2023 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/28/2023. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/trina-l-thompson/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
54 54 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Trina L Thompson for all further proceedings re 53 Notice of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patents. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/19/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
53 53 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Google LLC (Snyder, Darin)
Related: [-]
52 52 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc. for Google LLC. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant To Civ. L.R. 3-15 (Snyder, Darin)
Related: [-]
51 51 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2023 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
50 50 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:23-cv-00051. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
49 49 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2)
Related: [-]
48 48 ORDER GRANTING35 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ad3)
Related: [-]