New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew E Krause
Case #: 7:23-cv-08253
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:80a-3 Investment Company Act of 1940
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 5:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Concord Management LLC
220 White Plains Road
Tarrytown, NY 10591
Represented By
Benjamin Sean Fischer
Morvillo, Abramowitz, Grand, Iason, & Anello P.C.
contact info
Christopher Blake Harwood
Morvillo Abramowitz Grand Iason & Anello PC
contact info
Kevin Grossinger
Morvillo Abramowitz Grand Iason & Anello PC
contact info
Peter Menz
Morvillo Abramowitz Grand Iason & Anello P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Michael Matlin
Represented By
Benjamin Sean Fischer
Morvillo, Abramowitz, Grand, Iason, & Anello P.C.
contact info
Christopher Blake Harwood
Morvillo Abramowitz Grand Iason & Anello PC
contact info
Kevin Grossinger
Morvillo Abramowitz Grand Iason & Anello PC
contact info
Peter Menz
Morvillo Abramowitz Grand Iason & Anello P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By
Amy Harman Burkart
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Richard Mann Harper, II
U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission (ma)
contact info


Docket last updated: 84 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
57 57 order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 04/02 9:51 AM
ORDER granting56 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The parties are directed to file a status update letter by May 15, 2025. The video status conference scheduled for April 24, 2025 is hereby rescheduled to June 11, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Video links will be sent to all counsel in advance of the conference. Members of the public who wish to attend the conference may do so by telephone by (1) dialing the meeting number: (855) 244-8681; (2) entering the access code: 231 250 35451; (3) pressing pound (#); and (4) pressing pound (#) again to join the teleconference as a guest. Should the parties experience any technical issues with the teleconferencing system, please contact Chambers at (914) 390-4070. All discovery is stayed until the next conference. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause)(Text Only Order) (kj)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
56 56 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 03/31 5:41 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference And for a Forty-Five Day Stay addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from Benjamin S. Fischer dated March 31, 2025. Document filed by Concord Management LLC, Michael Matlin..(Fischer, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
55 55 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 03/31 9:59 AM
ORDER granting54 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard Mann Harper, II terminated (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause)(Text Only Order) (Krause, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 30, 2025
54 54 motion Withdraw as Attorney Sun 03/30 8:50 AM
MOTION for Richard M. Harper II to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Harper, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
53 53 13 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 03/26 2:43 PM
DECISION AND ORDER denying23 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons stated above, Defendants' motion to dismiss the failure-to-register claim asserted against Matlin individually (ECF No. 23) is DENIED. A video status conference to discuss the next steps in this matter is hereby scheduled for April 24, 2025 at 9:30 a.m. Video links will be sent to all counsel in advance of the conference. Members of the public who wish to attend the conference may do so by telephone by (1) dialing the meeting number: (855) 244-8681; (2) entering the access code: 231 250 35451; (3) pressing pound (#); and (4) pressing pound (#) again to join the teleconference as a guest. Should the parties experience any technical issues with the teleconferencing system, please contact Chambers at (914) 390-4070. At the conference, the parties must be prepared to discuss the schedule for any remaining discovery in the case and their interest in resuming settlement discussions, with the Court's assistance or through some other means. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 3/26/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 03/26 2:44 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/24/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause. (tg)
Related: [-]