California Northern District Court
Judge:Sallie Kim
Case #: 3:23-cv-04807
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Dec 19, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 2:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Reckitt Benckiser LLC
399 Interpace Parkway
Parsippany, NJ 07054
Plaintiff
Mari Jones
Represented By
Allan Kanner
Kanner And Whiteley LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Terminated: 10/10/2023


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
13 13 4 pgs order Order Terminate Civil Case Tue 12/19 9:48 AM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) by MDL Panel on 12/15/2023. (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Tue 12/19 10:07 AM
Case transferred to Eastern District of New York per CTO-1. (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
12 12 6 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 11/28 3:25 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 11 Stipulation.(sklc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
11 11 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 11/27 10:06 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Mari Jones.(Kanner, Allan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Monday, November 13, 2023
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 11/13 7:57 AM
CLERK'S THIRD NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/27/2023 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 11/27/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 10/20 3:16 PM
CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 11/3/2023 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/10 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Mari Jones (Kanner, Allan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 10/04 11:33 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/18/2023 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/18/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 09/21 2:43 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Thu 09/21 8:47 AM
Proposed Summons. (Kanner, Allan)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 09/21 8:00 AM
Summons Issued as to Reckitt Benckiser LLC, Reckitt Benckiser Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Tue 09/19 1:35 PM
Proposed Summons. (Kanner, Allan)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/19 1:14 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/3/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/19 1:00 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18657961.). Filed byMari Jones.(Kanner, Allan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet