California Northern District Court
Judge:Donna M Ryu
Case #: 4:23-cv-04802
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 09/27 5:34 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/27 6:55 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tomiann Lovelady.. (Zieman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order Tue 09/26 5:50 PM
ORDER re: 8 Amended Complaint filed by Tomiann Lovelady. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/26/2023. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/26 11:36 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi. Filed by Tomiann Lovelady. (Zieman, Richard) Modified on 9/26/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 09/26 11:12 AM
ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and screening complaint. Amended complaint due by 10/10/2023. Signed on 9/26/2023.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 09/21 6:29 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis complete application filed by Tomiann Lovelady. (Zieman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order Wed 09/20 11:49 AM
ORDER to Submit Complete IFP Application. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/20/2023. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Social Security Procedural Order Wed 09/20 10:35 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/19 10:57 AM
Case assigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/3/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 09/19 9:52 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tomiann Lovelady. (Zieman, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/19 9:49 AM
COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, Commissioner of Social Security. Filed byTomiann Lovelady.(Zieman, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet