California Northern District Court
Judge:Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referred: Pslc Jne
Case #: 3:23-cv-04799
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Jan 02, 2024
Petitioner
Nebiyu Soloman
Respondent
Eric Vega
Respondent
Jason Black

GPO Mar 05 2024
ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/5/2024. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
20 20 appeal USCA Order Wed 03/12 10:39 AM
ORDER of USCA as to16 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Nebiyu Soloman. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/05 8:48 AM
ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/5/2024. (ahm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Tue 03/05 8:49 AM
Remark: ECF19 mailed to Petitioner on 3/5/2024. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
18 18 appeal USCA Order Fri 03/01 3:33 PM
ORDER of USCA as to16 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Nebiyu Soloman. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
17 17 appeal USCA Case Number Thu 02/08 3:39 PM
USCA Case Number 24-693 for16 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Nebiyu Soloman. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
16 16 appeal Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit Wed 02/07 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Nebiyu Soloman. Appeal of Judgment,15 , Order of Dismissal,14 (IFP Request was Granted14 ).(wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope,
Att: 2 Letter to 9th Circuit,
Att: 3 Envelope
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
utility Remark Wed 01/03 9:01 AM
Remark: ECF14 and15 mailed to Petitioner on 1/3/2024. (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
15 15 order Judgment Tue 01/02 8:26 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/2/2024. (ahm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
14 14 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 01/02 8:25 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL; GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/2/2024. (ahm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 12/14 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Nebiyu Soloman.(mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, November 27, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 11/27 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Nebiyu Soloman (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, October 06, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 10/06 8:39 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 10/06/2023.(mbc, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment Fri 10/06 8:19 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bxl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 10/05 1:18 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nebiyu Soloman.(mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
8 8 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP Thu 10/05 1:16 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nebiyu Soloman. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Letter Thu 10/05 1:15 PM
Letter dated 9/28/23 from Nebiyu Soloman. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Thu 10/05 1:07 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed byNebiyu Soloman.(mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
5 5 misc Letter Thu 10/05 1:03 PM
Letter from Nebiyu Soloman. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
4 4 oth_evt Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 09/19 11:32 AM
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: IFP Tue 09/19 11:31 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/27/2023. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_evt Clerk's Notice to File Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint/Habeas Petition on Form Tue 09/19 11:30 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Petition on Form due by 10/27/2023. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Tue 09/19 11:14 AM
AFFIDAVIT in Support filed byNebiyu Soloman.(mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope