California Central District Court
Judge:Christina A Snyder
Referred: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Case #: 2:23-cv-07809
Nature of Suit540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Jan 02, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
18 18 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Tue 01/02 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Sergey Nikitenko. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Minevich, Gary)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
17 17 motion Dismiss Case Mon 12/11 2:01 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; and Declarations of John Lafferty and David Radel filed by Defendants Susan M. Curda, Ur M. Jaddou, Corinna Luna. Motion set for hearing on 1/29/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attorney Richard C. Burson added to party Susan M. Curda(pty:dft), Attorney Richard C. Burson added to party Ur M. Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Richard C. Burson added to party Corinna Luna(pty:dft)) (Burson, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of John Lafferty,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of David Radel,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
16 16 service Summons Issued Tue 10/10 3:29 PM
60-Day Summons Issued re Complaint1 as to Defendants Ur M. Jaddou, Director of the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services; Susan M. Curda as District Director of the Western Region of the Los Angeles District Office of the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services; Corinna Luna Los Angeles Field Office Director the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (gk)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Tue 10/10 1:17 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Summons Issued14 . The incorrect.pdf image was attached to the docket entry, The summons will be attached to this docket entry. SUMMONS ATTACHED. (shb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons on Complaint
14 14 service Summons Issued Tue 10/10 1:03 PM
EFER TO DOCKET #15 FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED] 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Susan M. Curda, Ur M. Jaddou, Corinna Luna. (shb) Modified on 10/10/2023 (shb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
13 13 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 10/06 12:40 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
12 12 notice Summons Request Tue 10/03 11:57 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,7 filed by Plaintiff Sergey Nikitenko. (Minevich, Gary)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 10/03 11:25 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Summons Request9 . The following error(s) was/were found: The summons is directed to the US District Court, Western District of the State of Washington instead of the United States District Court, Central District of California. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 10/03 11:21 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Summons Request8 . The following error(s) was/were found: The summons is directed to the US District Court, Western District of the State of Washington. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
9 9 notice Summons Request Mon 10/02 9:22 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request2 filed by Plaintiff Sergey Nikitenko. (Minevich, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
8 8 notice Summons Request Fri 09/22 4:18 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,7 filed by Plaintiff Sergey Nikitenko. (Minevich, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
7 7 notice Deficiency in Summons Thu 09/21 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request2 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 09/21 4:14 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 09/21 4:13 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (sh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 09/19 12:03 PM
Certification/Notice NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sergey Nikitenko, (Minevich, Gary)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 09/19 11:59 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sergey Nikitenko. (Minevich, Gary)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Tue 09/19 11:55 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Sergey Nikitenko. (Minevich, Gary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 09/19 11:51 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36065931 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Sergey Nikitenko. (Attorney Gary Minevich added to party Sergey Nikitenko(pty:pla))(Minevich, Gary)
Related: [-]