California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 4:23-cv-04805
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:May 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 2:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Matthew Craig Haney
Represented By
Patrick Ting
Office Of Legislative Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff
You Xue
P.O Box 1
Milbrae, CA 94030

GPO May 02 2024
ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 2, 2024. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 02, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/02 4:08 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 2, 2024. (mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/02 11:53 AM
NOTICE by Matthew Craig Haney of Settlement and [Proposed] Order Staying all Deadlines for 60 Days (Strumwasser, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
22 22 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 04/18 8:28 AM
ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 21 Stipulation. Responses due by 5/7/2024. Replies due by 5/14/2024.(mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
21 21 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 04/16 6:00 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Matthew Craig Haney. (Strumwasser, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
20 20 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 04/02 3:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First Amended Complaint , MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Matthew Craig Haney. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 4/16/2024. Replies due by 4/23/2024. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 6/27/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor.(Strumwasser, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Matt Haney in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Brian Bobb in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant Matthew Haney's Motion to Dismiss
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/27 2:42 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Matthew Craig Haney. Filed by You Xue. (Xue, You)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/27 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dale K Larson (Larson, Dale)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/27 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Gabriela Michel (Michel, Julia)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/27 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Jay Strumwasser (Strumwasser, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 03/05 8:38 AM
ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 14 Stipulation. Responses due by 4/2/2024.(mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
14 14 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 03/01 3:48 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Matthew Craig Haney. (Ting, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Tue 02/20 4:06 PM
CORRECTED CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. The case management conference erroneously set for 5/21/2024 is VACATED. Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than May 24, 2024 by 2:00 p.m. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Related [+] (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-] (s) 11
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Tue 02/20 8:36 AM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than May 20, 2024 by 2:00 p.m. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Related [+] (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-] (s) 11
Monday, February 19, 2024
11 11 order Order Mon 02/19 4:23 PM
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE The case management conference scheduled for February 20, 2024 is continued to May 28, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. Updated joint case management statements are due May 21, 2024. Plaintiff is ordered to seek entry of default by March 21, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Tigar, Jon) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 11, 2024
10 10 service Certificate/Proof of Service Sun 02/11 10:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by You Xue Substituted Service on Defendant Matthew Craig Haney (Xue, You)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Case Management Statement Sun 02/11 9:28 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by You Xue. (Xue, You)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 12/18 7:54 AM
ORDER RE SERVICE OF COMPLAINT. Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than February 16, 2024 by Noon. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 18, 2023. (mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Wed 12/13 12:25 PM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than December 18, 2023 by 2:00 p.m. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing Thu 09/28 8:21 AM
Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 3 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing.(mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 09/19 1:13 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (sec, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 09/19 1:12 PM
DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by You Xue.. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Permission for Electronic Case Filing Tue 09/19 1:11 PM
MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by You Xue. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 09/19 1:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Matthew Craig Haney. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/19 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Matthew Craig Haney. Filed byYou Xue.(sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Filing Fee Receipt