California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 3:23-cv-04809
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 2:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Rebel Wine Co. LLC
Represented By
J. Scott Gerien
Dickenson Peatman Fogarty
contact info
Mediator
A. James Isbester
Plaintiff
Roar Spirits, LLC
Represented By
Robert Antonio Rivas
Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro, Schulman & Rabkin, LLP
contact info
Benjamin J. Mandel
Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro, Schulman & Rabkin LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
8 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re Docket No.6 . Notice is hereby given that the initial case management conference, previously set for December 19, 2023 will be held telephonically on that date before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. The December 19, 2023 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for a telephonic case management conference are required to dial-in at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 Summons Issued as to Rebel Wine Co. LLC. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2023 02:00 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Levinrad, Eric)
Related: [-]
4 4 Case assigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Roar Spirits, LLC re1 Complaint (Levinrad, Eric)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Levinrad, Eric)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Rebel Wine Co. LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18658263.). Filed byRoar Spirits, LLC.(Levinrad, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (TTAB Opinion),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet