California Northern District Court
Judge:Trina L Thompson
Referred: Pslc Sjt
Case #: 3:23-cv-04796
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Jul 31, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
22 22 appeal USCA Order Fri 04/18 1:37 PM
ORDER of USCA as to20 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Karriem B. Shaheed (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
21 21 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 08/27 9:41 AM
USCA Case Number 24-5220 9th Circuit for20 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Karriem B. Shaheed. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
20 20 appeal Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit Fri 08/23 11:25 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Karriem B. Shaheed. (IFP Request was previously e-filed with the Court). (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
19 19 order Judgment Terminate Civil Case Wed 07/31 8:49 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 7/26/2024. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
18 18 10 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 07/31 8:47 AM
ORDER GRANTING 15 RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 7/26/2024. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
17 17 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Wed 04/03 8:51 AM
REPLY Related [+] filed byPeople of the State of California. (Ott, Gregory)
Related: [-] 15 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thursday, March 21, 2024
16 16 respoth Traverse Tue 03/26 1:16 PM
Traverse re15 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Karriem B. Shaheed.(wsn, COURT STAFF) Modified on 3/26/2024 (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
Friday, January 19, 2024
15 15 motion Dismiss PSP Fri 01/19 4:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by People of the State of California. Responses due by 2/16/2024. Replies due by 3/1/2024.(Ott, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Certificate/Proof of Service
Thursday, November 30, 2023
14 14 misc Filing Fee Received Mon 12/04 8:29 AM
Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 311166894. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
utility Remark Wed 11/22 10:36 AM
*** E-mailed docs per13 Order *** (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
13 13 3 pgs order Order Tue 11/21 10:04 AM
ORDER DENYING 6 8 IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS; DIRECTING PETITIONER TO PAY FILING FEE; AND DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE PETITION SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 11/20/2023. (rfm, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
12 12 misc Letter Fri 11/17 11:49 AM
Letter from James Conrad Stull. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
utility Remark Tue 11/14 12:54 PM
Mailed copy of docket sheet to plaintiff at CTF.(ljf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/30 9:28 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Trina L Thompson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 10/30/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 29, 2023
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment Sun 10/29 11:10 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (rmm2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope Service Label/Proof of Service
Monday, October 23, 2023
9 9 misc Letter Mon 10/23 7:18 PM
Letter dated 10/19/2023 from Karriem Shaheed. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP Mon 10/23 7:16 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Karriem B. Shaheed. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, October 19, 2023
7 7 misc Prison Trust Fund Account Statement Thu 10/19 8:38 AM
Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Karriem B. Shaheed. (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP - CDCR Tue 10/17 4:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shaheed B. Karriem, CDCR # H65017. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov.(lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, October 06, 2023
5 5 misc Letter Fri 10/06 4:06 PM
Letter from Shaheed Karriem. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Fri 10/06 4:06 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed byShaheed B. Karriem.(far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
3 3 oth_evt Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 09/19 1:23 PM
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (gba, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: IFP Tue 09/19 1:21 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/27/2023. (gba, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 09/19 1:19 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Shaheed B. Karriem. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits part 1,
Att: 2 Exhibits part 2,
Att: 3 Letter,
Att: 4 Envelope