Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Michael G Gotsch, Sr
Case #: 3:23-cv-00856
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Nov 16, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 4:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Neuropsychiatric Hospital of Greater Houston, LLC
Represented By
Daniel J Gibson
Delk Mcnally Llp - Mun/in
contact info
Michael T McNally
Delk Mcnally Llp - Car/in
contact info
Jagen P Arnold
Delk Mcnally Llp - Mun/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly Limanni
Represented By
Andrew Dutkanych, III
Biesecker Dutkanych & Macer Llc - Ind/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, November 16, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 11/17 12:25 PM
ORDER: The court GRANTS the stipulation16 , DENIES AS MOOT Ms. Limanni's motion to extend the time to file an amended complaint14 , and DISMISSES this case WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 11/16/2023. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
16 16 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Tue 11/14 3:55 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Kimberly Limanni. (Dutkanych, Andrew)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/14 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jagen P Arnold on behalf of Neuropsychiatric Hospital of Greater Houston, LLC (Arnold, Jagen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
14 14 motion Extension of Time to Amend Thu 11/09 6:11 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend, by Plaintiff Kimberly Limanni. (Dutkanych, Andrew)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice - Other Thu 11/09 4:41 PM
NOTICE by Neuropsychiatric Hospital of Greater Houston, LLC of Citizenship (McNally, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/01 8:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Gibson on behalf of Neuropsychiatric Hospital of Greater Houston, LLC (Gibson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 11/01 11:56 AM
Reset Deadlines: Neuropsychiatric Hospital of Greater Houston, LLC Answer due 11/28/2023 pursuant to DE11 . (kmt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
11 11 notice Notice - Other Tue 10/31 5:08 PM
NOTICE by Neuropsychiatric Hospital of Greater Houston, LLC of Initial Automatic Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint (McNally, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/31 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T McNally on behalf of Neuropsychiatric Hospital of Greater Houston, LLC (McNally, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Mon 10/30 3:05 PM
ORDER: The court GRANTS the motion8 and EXTENDS the time to file an amended complaint to 11/9/2023. The court ORDERS Neuropsychiatric to file its citizenship information upon its first appearance in the case. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 10/30/2023. (sej)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
8 8 motion Extension of Time to Amend Mon 10/23 10:24 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 7 Order,, Set Deadlines, by Plaintiff Kimberly Limanni. (Dutkanych, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
7 7 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 10/12 10:43 AM
ORDER: The court STRIKES the amended complaint 6 as noncompliant with the court's order5 . Consistent with the court's order5 , Ms. Limanni may file an amended complaint by 10/23/23 after conferring with the defendant as to citizenship. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 10/12/23. (dnj)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Thu 10/12 8:11 AM
***Amended Pleadings Deadline terminated. (mlc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/06 2:48 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Neuropsychiatric Hospital of Greater Houston, LLC, filed by Kimberly Limanni.(Dutkanych, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 10/02 2:37 PM
ORDER: The court ORDERS Ms. Limanni to amend her complaint by 10/23/2023, addressing the citizenship concerns outlined in this order, else the case may be dismissed without further notice. If necessary, she may obtain the membership information from the defendant once served. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 10/2/2023. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/28 5:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Limanni. Neuropsychiatric Hospital of Greater Houston, LLC served on 9/25/2023, answer due 10/16/2023. (Dutkanych, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 09/21 8:09 AM
Summons Issued as to Neuropsychiatric Hospital of Greater Houston, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ash)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 09/21 8:05 AM
Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. **NEW CASE** (ash)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 09/20 9:51 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against NEUROPSYCHIATRIC HOSPITAL OF GREATER HOUSTON, LLC d/b/a NEUROPSYCHIATRIC HOSPITAL( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5358985.), filed by KIMBERLY LIMANNI.(Dutkanych, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
1 1 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/20 9:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Dutkanych, III on behalf of KIMBERLY LIMANNI (Dutkanych, Andrew)
Related: [-]