Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Jeffery P Hopkins
Referred: Stephanie K Bowman
Case #: 1:23-cv-00592
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Jan 28, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 5:45 AM EDT
Defendant
The Phoenix Center Inc.
Executive Office 1007 North Second St.
Ironton, OH 45638
Represented By
Rick Louis Brunner
Brunner Quinn
contact info
Brigham M Anderson
Anderson & Anderson
contact info
Patrick M Quinn
Brunner Quinn
contact info
Plaintiff
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Detroit Field Office 477 Michigan Avenue Room 865
Detroit, MI 48226
Represented By
Gena Miller
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info

GPO Oct 09 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs motion to compel (Doc. 13) is GRANTED in part; 2. Defendant shall complete the supplementation of its discovery responses within fourteen (14) days of this Memorandum Opinion and Order; 3. The parties shall meet and confer and file any motion seeking an extension of existing deadlines, including the dispositive motion deadline, on or before October 23, 2024; 4. Defendant shall pay costs and attorneys fees associated with the EEOCs formal written motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/09/2024. (bjc)

Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
26 26 12 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 01/28 4:31 PM
CONSENT DECREE. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 1/28/2025. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
motion Oral Request Thu 01/02 10:35 AM
Oral Request for Production of Discovery by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (km)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Order on Oral Request Thu 01/02 10:38 AM
Minute Order. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Informal Discovery Conference held 1/2/2025. Attorney Gena Miller appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorney Patrick Quinn appeared on behalf of Defendant. Plaintiff's informal motion for discovery is granted. Defendant to provide signed interrogatory responses, all organizational charts, and emails in their native format by close of business Monday, 1/6/2025. (km)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
24 24 misc Reply (non motion) Mon 11/25 11:25 AM
Reply by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Miller, Gena)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
23 23 4 pgs misc Response (non motion) Mon 11/18 9:48 PM
Response by Defendant The Phoenix Center Inc.. (Quinn, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
22 22 misc Bill of Costs Wed 11/06 5:17 PM
BILL OF COSTS by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Miller, Gena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Atty. hours,
Att: 2 Exhibit EOL Study
Thursday, October 31, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order Setting Mediation Thu 10/31 10:55 AM
Order Setting Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference set for Thursday, January 23, 2025 at 9:00 A.M.-EST before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz via videoconferencing (Zoom for Government) Zoomgov.com - Should the parties desire the Courts consideration of an in-person mediation, counsel shall advise the chambers of the undersigned, in writing, within 14 days prior to the conference, of the total number of participants (counsel and client representatives) they anticipate being present at the mediation. The Court shall then determine if an in-person mediation with social distancing can be accommodated . The parties shall exchange fully documented settlement demands and counter-offers within the time frames set forth in the Order. Ex parte settlement statements are due to the Court no later than January 16, 2025, at Noon. Statements shall be submitted directly to chambers either by email at litkovitz_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov or by fax at (513) 564-7691 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 10/31/2024. (art)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
order Order Tue 10/29 9:45 AM
NOTATION ORDER - In light of the Court granting Defendant an extension of time through and including 11/6/2024 in which to comply with the undersigned's Order of 10/9/2024 (doc.16 ) with respect to providing Plaintiff with supplemental discovery responses as outlined in the Order, the Court further extends the deadline for the EEOC to submit a record of its costs and fees until such time as Defendant complies with the Court's Order, or no later than 11/6/2024 . Defendant shall then have 10 days following service in which to file any particularized objections, with Plaintiff to file any reply in support within 5 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/29/2024. (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 10/24 8:44 AM
NOTATION ORDER - This matter is before the Court on Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Provide Supplemental Discovery (doc.20 ). The undersigned notes that Defendant's motion does not comply with S. D. Ohio Civ. R. 7.3(a). Notwithstanding this, the Court finds the basis of Defendant's motion well taken. Additionally, the parties have sought a referral to court based mediation and are currently in the process of scheduling a mediation before Magistrate Judge Litkovitz. Accordingly, Defendant's motion (doc.20 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall have an additional two (2) weeks, through and including 11/6/2024, in which to comply with the undersigned's Order of 10/9/2024 (doc.16 ) with respect to providing Plaintiff with supplemental discovery responses as outlined in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/24/2024. (km)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time Wed 10/23 7:50 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 11/6/2024. by Defendant The Phoenix Center Inc.. (Quinn, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 10/17 2:00 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to file dispositive motions is extended to 28 days after a facilitative mediation or a settlement conference with the Court has failed. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 10/17/2024. (kmc)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 10/17 1:52 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz for settlement purposes only. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 10/17/2024. (kmc)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extension of Time Thu 10/17 12:41 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/17/2024. by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Miller, Gena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
16 16 12 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Wed 10/09 7:51 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs motion to compel (Doc.13 ) is GRANTED in part; 2. Defendant shall complete the supplementation of its discovery responses within fourteen (14) days of this Memorandum Opinion and Order; 3. The parties shall meet and confer and file any motion seeking an extension of existing deadlines, including the dispositive motion deadline, on or before October 23, 2024; 4. Defendant shall pay costs and attorneys fees associated with the EEOCs formal written motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/09/2024. (bjc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 09/05 10:19 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 First MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Miller, Gena)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 08/22 9:45 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 First MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant The Phoenix Center Inc.. (Quinn, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 08/13 12:21 PM
NOTATION ORDER: The Telephone Status Conference set for 9/11/2024 at 2:30 p.m. is hereby VACATED. Counsel shall reach out to the Court via email once the pending Motion to Compel has been resolved. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 8/13/2024. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
13 13 motion Compel Thu 08/01 1:51 PM
First MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Miller, Gena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit List,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10
Friday, May 24, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 05/24 11:39 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Telephone Discovery Conference held on 5/24/2024. Attorney Gena Miller appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorney Patrick Quinn appeared on behalf of Defendant. Defendant has 14 days to fully complete outstanding discovery. If it is not completed within 14 days, Plaintiff is granted leave to file a motion to compel. (km)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 05/20 8:29 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brigham M Anderson terminated. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 5/20/2024. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 05/14 12:30 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. The Magistrate Judge is empowered to decide all discovery-related motions and issues. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 5/14/2024. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
9 9 trial Witness List Wed 05/01 4:55 PM
Witness List by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Miller, Gena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
8 8 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 03/27 4:12 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant The Phoenix Center Inc.. (Anderson, Brigham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order Wed 03/13 12:28 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER - A preliminary pretrial conference was held by telephone in this case on March 13, 2024. Attorney Gena Miller appeared on behalf of Plaintiff; Attorneys Patrick Quinn and Brigham Anderson appeared on behalf of Defendant. PERTINENT SETTINGS 1. Required disclosures under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1): N/A 2. Response to Plaintiffs settlement demand by Defendant, to be made by: Defendants Response Due 3/22/2024 3. Deadline for motions directed to pleadings: 11/20/2023 4. Deadline for motions to amend pleadings and/or add parties: 12/11/2023 Following these dates, motions directed to pleadings and amendment to pleadings may be made only upon leave of Court, with notice to opposing counsel. 5. Disclosure of lay witnesses: 5/1/2024 6. Plaintiffs expert report(s) and designation(s): N/A 7. Defendants expert report(s) and designation(s): 6/30/2024. 8. Rebuttal expert report(s) and designation(s): 7/30/2024 9. Telephone status conference to discuss settlement negotiations and alternative dispute resolution mechanisms: 9/11/2024 10. Deadline for discovery: 9/30/2024 11. Dispositive motion deadline: 10/30/2024 Motions for summary judgment shall not be filed before the close of discovery without leave of Court. See Standing Order Governing Civil Cases. 12. Final Pretrial Conference: To be determined 13. Jury Trial: To be determined. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 03/13/2024. (bjc)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 03/13 4:09 PM
Minute entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 3/13/2024. Attorney Appearances: Attorney Gena Miller appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff; Attorneys Patrick Quinn and Mack Anderson appeared on behalf of the Defendant. Case matters discussed. Telephone Status Conference to be set for 9/11/24 at 2:30 pm. The Court will issue a separate Notice of Hearing. Scheduling Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Linda Mullen) (kmc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
6 6 12 pgs order Protective Order Thu 03/07 1:03 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 3/7/2024. (zmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
5 5 5 pgs misc Rule 26(f) Report Wed 03/06 3:36 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Miller, Gena)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
4 4 1 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/20 4:23 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant The Phoenix Center Inc.. (Quinn, Patrick)
Related: [-]
3 3 7 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/20 4:21 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint filed by The Phoenix Center Inc.. (Quinn, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 09/21 11:29 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to The Phoenix Center Inc. on 9/21/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. (Miller, Gena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
misc Docket Annotation Wed 09/20 9:07 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (zmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/19 2:57 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Phoenix Center Inc., filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Miller, Gena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet