California Northern District Court
Judge:William Alsup
Case #: 3:23-cv-04811
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Apr 26, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 2:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Waverider Security, Inc.
3075 Avenida Magoria
Escondido, CA 92029
Represented By
Richard Payne
Lounsbery Ferguson Altona & Peak
contact info
Chandra Eskender Kiamilev
Lounsbery Ferguson Altona & Peak LLP
contact info
Mediator
David M. Bluhm
Law Office of David M. Blum 4289 Piedmont Ave., #207
Oakland, CA 94611
Plaintiff
Tanium, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey V. Ta
Lagasse Branch Bell And Kinkead LLP
contact info
Hilary Wild
Lagasse Branch Bell & Kinkead
contact info
Ann Marie Arcadi
Arcadi Jackson LLP
contact info
Aaron C. Christian
Arcadi Jackson, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 26, 2024
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 04/26 1:58 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc4, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
29 29 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 04/22 1:09 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Final Judgment) filed by Tanium, Inc..(Christian, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Agreed Judgment
Thursday, March 07, 2024
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 03/07 1:50 PM
Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 4/18/2024 10:00 AM via Zoom. (af, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
28 28 adr ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator Fri 02/02 1:04 PM
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing David M. Bluhm as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
27 27 order Case Management Scheduling Order ~Util - Case Referred to Mediation Thu 01/25 12:38 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Bench Trial set for 11/4/2024 07:30 AM before Judge William Alsup. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2024. Close of Fact Discovery due by 6/7/2024. Motions due by 7/25/2024. Case referred to court-sponsored mediation. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/25/2024. (afm, COURT STAFF) (Main Document 27 replaced on 1/25/2024) (notewarel, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
26 26 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Case Referred to Mediation Thu 01/25 12:27 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/25/2024. The Court set the following deadlines: Initial Disclosures due 2/9/2024; amendment to pleadings due 4/30/2024; Fact Discovery and Expert Reports due 6/7/2024; dispositive motion due date is 7/25/2024; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2024; Bench Trial set for 11/4/2024 at 7:30AM. Case referred to David Bluhm re court-sponsored mediation. Case Management Order to issue. Digital Recording Time: 11:27 - 11:42 = 15 Minutes (Liberty). Plaintiff Attorney: Hilary Wild, Aaron Christian. Defendant Attorney: Richard Payne. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/25/2024) Modified on 1/25/2024 (afm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
25 25 3 pgs order Order Thu 01/25 11:50 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER 19 . Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc4, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Mediation Thu 01/25 12:42 PM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
24 24 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/19 1:19 PM
ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (afm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
23 23 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/19 1:17 PM
ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (afm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/19 12:35 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19028596.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/17/2024 filed by Tanium, Inc..(Christian, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
21 21 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/19 12:29 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19031082.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/17/2023 filed by Tanium, Inc..(Arcadi, Ann)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/19 8:44 AM
ORDER DENYING 17 18 APPLICATIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/19/2024. (afm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
19 19 misc Joint Case Management Statement Thu 01/18 4:11 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by Tanium, Inc..(Wild, Hilary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Rule 502(d) Order,
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
18 18 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/17 3:57 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19031082.) filed by Tanium, Inc..(Arcadi, Ann)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
17 17 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/17 12:06 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19028596.) filed by Tanium, Inc..(Christian, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
16 16 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 01/16 5:20 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Tanium, Inc. (Wild, Hilary)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 01/16 4:31 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Waverider Security, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Waverider Security, Inc. for Waverider Security, Inc.. (Payne, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
14 14 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Fri 12/15 12:33 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Wild, Hilary)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 10/20 7:02 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2024. Initial Case Management Conference RESET for 1/25/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Parties may download Judge Alsup's standing orders from the Court's webpage: https://cand.uscourts.gov/judges/alsup-william-wha/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/16 6:18 PM
ANSWER to Complaint byWaverider Security, Inc.. (Kiamilev, Chandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/04 8:55 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/04/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 10/03 2:26 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 10/03 9:53 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tanium, Inc...(Ta, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Friday, September 29, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/29 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hilary Wild(Wild, Hilary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Thursday, September 28, 2023
7 7 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 09/28 3:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tanium, Inc. re1 Complaint,4 Summons Issued,5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Ta, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 09/28 2:26 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tanium, Inc. re1 Complaint,4 Summons Issued,5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Ta, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 09/28 3:18 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . No title Page. Certificates/Proofs of Service e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. [err201] Re:6 Certificate of Service filed by Tanium, Inc. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 09/19 4:39 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 09/19 4:37 PM
Summons Issued as to Waverider Security, Inc.. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/19 3:07 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/3/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 09/19 2:40 PM
Proposed Summons. (Ta, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 97 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/19 2:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Waverider Security, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18658707.). Filed byTanium, Inc..(Ta, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet