California Northern District Court
Judge:Trina L Thompson
Case #: 3:23-cv-04812
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Oct 29, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 2:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Chandani Latey
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Danielle E. Lehman
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Chandani Latey
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro N. Mayorkas
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Chandani Latey
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Chen Fu
Represented By
Justin X. Wang
Baughman & Wang
contact info
Trent Goulding
Baughman & Wang
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/29 11:59 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chen Fu (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 03/25 8:54 AM
ORDER GRANTING 23 STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ORDER. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 3/25/2024. Case stayed until 11/5/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2024 is re-set for 11/14/2024 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Joint Status Report due by 11/7/2024. (rfm, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
23 23 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 03/22 10:56 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; filed by Ur M. Jaddou, Danielle E. Lehman, Alejandro N. Mayorkas. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
22 22 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 03/07 11:07 AM
ORDER GRANTING 21 SECOND STIPULATION TO A REVISED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Trina L Thompson on 3/7/2024. Defendants' Dispositive Motion and Responses now due by 3/22/2024. Plaintiff's Responses and Replies now due by 4/12/2024. Defendants' Replies now due by 5/3/2024. Motion Hearing on 6/4/2024 at 2:00 PM is maintained. Further Case Management Conference on 5/9/2024 at 2:00 PM is maintained. (rfm, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
21 21 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 03/06 4:08 PM
Second Stipulation to a Revised Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; [Proposed] Order filed by Ur M. Jaddou, Danielle E. Lehman, Alejandro N. Mayorkas and Chen Fu. (Kurlan, Elizabeth) Modified on 3/6/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
20 20 3 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 02/22 11:17 AM
ORDER GRANTING 19 STIPULATION TO A REVISED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 2/22/2024. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2024 is re-set for 6/4/2024 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Trina L Thompson. Defendants' Responses and Dispositive Motion now due by 3/8/2024. Plaintiff's Replies and Responses now due by 3/29/2024. Defendants' Replies due by 4/19/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2024 is re-set for 5/9/2024 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2024. (rfm, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
19 19 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 02/09 4:33 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to a Revised Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; [Proposed] Order filed by Ur M. Jaddou, Danielle E. Lehman, Alejandro N. Mayorkas. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/09 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
17 17 motion Summary Judgment Mon 01/15 5:12 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Chen Fu. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 4/23/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Trina L Thompson. Responses due by 2/14/2024. Replies due by 3/6/2024.(Goulding, Trent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration w/Exhibits A, B, C,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Tue 01/09 8:50 AM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2024 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2024. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/trina-l-thompson/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 12/18 8:48 AM
ORDER GRANTING 14 STIPULATION TO PROPOSED SCHEDULE FOR THE PARTIES' SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 12/15/2023. Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/15/2024. Responses / Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/14/2024. MSJ Replies / Cross-MSJ Responses due by 3/6/2024. Cross-MSJ Replies due b 3/27/2024. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 4/23/2024 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Trina L Thompson. (rfm, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
14 14 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 12/14 12:47 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER on Briefing Schedule filed by Chen Fu. (Goulding, Trent)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/27 11:46 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Trina L Thompson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 11/27/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Mon 11/27 11:01 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/22 4:52 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Ur M. Jaddou, Danielle E. Lehman, Alejandro N. Mayorkas. (Latey, Chandani)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
10 10 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 11/17 2:14 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chen Fu.. (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 10/17 12:12 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chen Fu.. (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 10/04 11:35 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/18/2023 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/18/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 09/26 2:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chen Fu. Ur M. Jaddou served on 9/25/2023, answer due 11/24/2023; Danielle E. Lehman served on 9/25/2023, answer due 11/24/2023; Alejandro N. Mayorkas served on 9/25/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
6 6 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Wed 09/20 9:21 AM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 09/20 9:19 AM
Summons Issued as to Ur M. Jaddou, Danielle E. Lehman, Alejandro N. Mayorkas. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/19 3:12 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/3/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 09/19 2:42 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Chen Fu (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 09/19 2:39 PM
Proposed Summons. (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/19 2:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Ur M. Jaddou, Danielle E. Lehman, Alejandro N. Mayorkas ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18658823.). Filed byChen Fu.(Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet