California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 4:23-cv-04809
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 2:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Rebel Wine Co. LLC
Represented By
J. Scott Gerien
Dickenson Peatman Fogarty
contact info
Mediator
A. James Isbester
Plaintiff
Roar Spirits, LLC
Represented By
Robert Antonio Rivas
Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro, Schulman & Rabkin, LLP
contact info
Benjamin J. Mandel
Wolf, Rifkin, Shapiro, Schulman & Rabkin LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 04 2024
SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 2/16/2024; Close of Fact Discovery due by 5/17/2024; Opening Reports due by 5/21/2024; Rebuttal Reports due by 6/14/2024; Close of Expert Discovery due by 7/5/2024. Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2024 03:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; and Bench Trial (3-day) set for 12/9/2024 08:30 AM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/4/2024. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2024)
GPO Jan 05 2024
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2024)
GPO Mar 21 2024
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 22 Proposed STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2024)
GPO Oct 15 2024
ORDER (as modified) GRANTING 42 STIPULATION TO ADD MATTER TO CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2024 02:00 PM via a Zoom webinar.All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for the case management conference are required to join at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/hsg General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/15/2024. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2024)
GPO Oct 15 2024
ORDER (as modified ) by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 43 Stipulation TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2024)
GPO Feb 18 2025
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT'S JOINT 33 MOTION TO SEAL AND GRANTING DEFENDANT'S 36 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2025)
GPO Feb 18 2025
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANTS 35 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 38 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND OVERRULING 41 PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS REPLY EVIDENCE.**This Order also TERMINATES Docket Nos. 50-53 and 64.**(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18 /2025)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
74 74 misc Transcript Fri 04/25 3:08 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on November 19, 2024, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, RMR, CRR, CCRR, FCRR, telephone number 510-565-7228, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2025. (Mercado, Raynee)
Related: [-] 71 Transcript Order 71