New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Lashann Dearcy Hall
Referred: Cheryl L Pollak
Case #: 1:23-cv-06941
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Feb 15, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 5:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Brooklyn Coachworks Inc.
Defendant
Daniel Marcello
Plaintiff
Babatope Awotona
Represented By
David M. Fish
Romano Law PLLC
contact info
Andres Alfredo Munoz
Romano Law PLLC
contact info
Andrew Ramstad
Romano Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 15, 2024
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 02/15 1:02 PM
Civil Case Terminated re17 . (MLR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 02/14 6:06 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Babatope Awotona (Munoz, Andres)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
order Status Report Order Tue 01/30 1:21 PM
ORDER re16 The parties are directed to file a stipulation of discontinuance by 2/20/2024. If the parties are unable to file the stipulation by the deadline, they shall instead file a status report explaining any delay. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/30/2024. (DC)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
16 16 misc Letter Fri 01/26 9:48 PM
Letter regarding Case Status by Babatope Awotona (Munoz, Andres)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
order Status Report Order Wed 01/10 3:50 PM
ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 1/26/2024 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/10/2024. (CH)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
15 15 misc Letter Mon 01/08 4:32 PM
Letter regarding Case Status by Babatope Awotona (Ramstad, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
order Status Report Order Tue 12/19 9:23 AM
ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 1/8/2024 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 12/19/2023. (CH)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
14 14 misc Letter Mon 12/18 5:06 PM
Letter regarding Case Status by Babatope Awotona (Ramstad, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
13 13 misc Letter Thu 11/30 4:09 PM
Letter regarding Case Status by Babatope Awotona (Ramstad, Andrew)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Thu 11/30 4:18 PM
ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 12/18/2023 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/30/2023. (CH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
order Status Report Order Tue 10/31 1:04 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: The plaintiff is Ordered to provide a status letter to this Court by 11/30/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/31/2023. (DC)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/06 12:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Babatope Awotona. Daniel Marcello served on 10/2/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. (Ramstad, Andrew)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/06 12:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Babatope Awotona. Brooklyn Coachworks Inc. served on 10/2/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. (Ramstad, Andrew)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/06 12:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Babatope Awotona. Brooklyn Coachworks Inc. served on 9/26/2023, answer due 10/17/2023. (Ramstad, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
9 9 service Summons Issued Fri 09/22 4:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Brooklyn Coachworks Inc., Daniel Marcello.. (ML)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Daniel Marcello
8 8 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 09/22 4:38 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Babatope Awotona (Ramstad, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
7 7 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 09/21 11:00 AM
Proposed Summons. by Babatope Awotona (Ramstad, Andrew)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 09/21 10:58 AM
Proposed Summons. by Babatope Awotona (Ramstad, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 09/20 1:37 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 09/20 1:36 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/20 1:36 PM
Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Wed 09/20 1:38 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The CLERK OF COURT NAME NEEDS TO BE UPDATED/CORRECTED. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (KD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/19 6:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Ramstad on behalf of Babatope Awotona (aty to be noticed) (Ramstad, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/19 6:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Fish on behalf of Babatope Awotona (aty to be noticed) (Fish, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/19 5:36 PM
COMPLAINT against Brooklyn Coachworks Inc., Daniel Marcello filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17100319 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Babatope Awotona. (Munoz, Andres)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - Brooklyn Coachworks Inc.,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - Daniel Marcello