California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:M Elaine Hammond
Case #: 5:23-bk-51067
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Oct 17, 2023
Claims Deadline:Jan 16, 2024
Terminated:Dec 26, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Oct 29, 2024

Debtor
California Wine Transport, Inc.
930 McLaughlin Ave.
San Jose, CA 95122
Represented By
Roger Brian Irion
Law Offices Of Brian Irion
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Not Assigned - SJ
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ
U.S. Federal Bldg. 280 S 1st St. #268
San Jose, CA 95113


Docket last updated: 17 minutes ago
Saturday, December 28, 2024
181 181 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/28 9:13 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 12/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 180 Final Decree
Thursday, December 26, 2024
180 180 order Final Decree Thu 12/26 2:28 PM
Final Decree (lj)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 12/26 2:33 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (lj)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
179 179 order Final Decree Mon 12/23 3:29 PM
Order Authorizing Entry of Final Decree Related [+] (acr)
Related: [-] 178
178 178 motion Final Decree Mon 12/23 10:39 AM
Application for Entry of Final Decree Filed by Debtor California Wine Transport, Inc. (Irion, Roger)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Brian Irion re: App Default Final Decree