California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Referred: Pslc Llh
Case #: 3:23-cv-04798
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Mar 18, 2025
Defendant
Anjuli Basu
Defendant
Barragen
Defendant
Joseph Francis Bielefeld
Defendant
Luisa Nolasco
Plaintiff
James Henry Flournoy

GPO Mar 26 2024
ORDER OF SERVICE Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/26/2024. Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 6/24/2024. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)copy placed in O:drive for mailing on 3/26/2024

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 21, 2025
60 60 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 03/26 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by James Henry Flournoy -updated(hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
59 59 order Judgment Tue 03/18 1:35 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/18/2025. (ls, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
58 58 13 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Tue 03/18 1:34 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ls, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]