California Northern District Court
Judge:William Alsup
Case #: 3:23-cv-04814
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 2:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
USCIS
Ur Jaddou, USCIS 5900 Capital Gateway Drive Mail Stop 2120
Camp Springs, MD 20588
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Imelda Perez Mendoza
Represented By
Jessica T. Arena
Law Office Of Jessica T. Arena
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 23, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/23 6:47 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Imelda Perez Mendoza (Arena, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
11 11 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 05/02 9:40 AM
ORDER GRANTING 10 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE STAY OF PROCEEDINGS. Stay extended to May 31, 2024. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/2/2024. (afm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
10 10 misc Status Report Wed 05/01 3:11 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Stipulation to Continue the Stay of Proceedings; [Proposed] Order by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, USCIS. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/22 9:07 AM
ORDER RE STAY OF PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
8 8 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 11/17 10:06 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Stay Proceedings; [Proposed] Order filed by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, USCIS. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/17 10:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 09/26 1:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Imelda Perez Mendoza. All Defendants.(Arena, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - USPS Tracking Results
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 09/20 12:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, USCIS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Wed 09/20 12:47 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 09/20 8:28 AM
Case assigned to Judge William Alsup. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 09/19 3:18 PM
Proposed Summons. (Arena, Jessica)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/19 3:14 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18659090.). Filed byImelda Perez Mendoza.(Arena, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - I-589 Receipt Notice,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet