California Northern District Court
Judge:Sallie Kim
Case #: 3:23-cv-04816
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 2:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
USCIS
Ur Jaddou, USCIS 5900 Capital Gateway Drive Mail Stop 2120
Camp Springs, MD 20588
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Luis Alberto Calmo Mendoza
Represented By
Jessica T. Arena
Law Office Of Jessica T. Arena
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, June 03, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 06/03 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Luis Alberto Calmo Mendoza (Arena, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/16 4:36 PM
ORDER granting stipulation 13 to extend stay of proceedings. Joint status report due 6/17/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 5/16/2024. (sklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Status Report Thu 05/16 11:55 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Stipulation to Continue the Stay of Proceedings; [Proposed] Order by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, USCIS. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 11/28 9:25 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 11 Stipulation to Stay this Matter. Status Report due by 5/16/2024. (sklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
11 11 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 11/27 2:30 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Stay Proceedings; [Proposed] Order filed by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, USCIS. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 11/27 2:23 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, USCIS.. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/27 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 09/26 1:10 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Luis Alberto Calmo Mendoza.. (Arena, Jessica)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 09/26 1:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Alberto Calmo Mendoza. All Defendants.(Arena, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - USPS Tracking Results
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 09/20 2:04 PM
Summons Issued as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, USCIS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Wed 09/20 2:03 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Tue 09/19 3:50 PM
Proposed Summons. (Arena, Jessica)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Tue 09/19 3:47 PM
COMPLAINT Corrected, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18659309 against All Defendants. Filed byLuis Alberto Calmo Mendoza.(Arena, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - I-589 Receipt Notice,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/19 3:37 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/3/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/19 3:33 PM
*** FILED IN ERROR WITH WRONG ATTACHMENTS,REFER TO DOCUMENT 3 *** COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18659309.). Filed byLuis Alberto Calmo Mendoza.(Arena, Jessica) Modified on 9/19/2023 (fff, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - I-589 Receipt Notice,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet