California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 4:23-mc-80235
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Dec 06, 2024
Petitioner
Ballon Josephine
Petitioner
Grinberg Avital
Petitioner
HateAid gGmbH
Respondent
Twitter International Unlimited Company (TIUC)
Respondent
X CORP.

GPO Oct 04 2023
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Ralph M. Stone. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2023)
GPO Oct 25 2023
ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/25/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2023)
GPO Jul 30 2024
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 22 Administrative Motion Re 21 Supplemental Brief. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2024)
GPO Dec 06 2024
ORDER DENYING 1 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1782. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/6/2024. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2024)
GPO Feb 11 2025
RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. RE Docket No. 27. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2025)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Tue 02/11 10:28 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. RE Docket No. 27 . (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
28 28 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 02/10 3:52 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byX CORP..(Hawk, James)
Related: [-] 27 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Determination Whether New Application Should Be Assigned Based on Relatedness
Att: 1 Declaration of Markus Langen,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
27 27 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Wed 02/05 1:59 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Determination Whether New Application Should Be Assigned Based on Relatedness filed by HateAid gGmbH, Ballon Josephine, Grinberg Avital. Responses due by 2/10/2025.(Stone, Ralph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Application of Ballon and Grinberg),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (Decl of Josephine Ballon),
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 (Civil Cover Sheet),
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 (Jan 27, 2025 Order),
Att: 5 Declaration of Ralph M. Stone,
Att: 6 Proposed Order
Friday, December 06, 2024
26 26 4 pgs order Order Terminate Civil Case Fri 12/06 8:24 AM
ORDER DENYING 1 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1782. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/6/2024. (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/02 11:02 AM
NOTICE by HateAid gGmbH, Ballon Josephine, Grinberg Avital re1 Ex Parte Application Notice of Submitted Matter Under Local Rule 7-13 (Stone, Ralph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
24 24 respoth Response Tue 07/30 4:01 PM
Response re23 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11,21 Supplemental Brief, by X CORP..(Hawk, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Markus Langen,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Tue 07/30 8:22 AM
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 22 Administrative Motion Re 21 Supplemental Brief. (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
22 22 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Mon 07/29 2:42 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re21 Supplemental Brief, filed by X CORP.. Responses due by 8/2/2024.(Hawk, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Declaration of Jon Hawk,
Att: 4 Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Monday, July 08, 2024
21 21 oth_sup Supplemental Brief Mon 07/08 8:40 AM
Supplemental Brief in Support of Application for Section 1782 Assistance filed byGrinberg Avital, HateAid gGmbH, Ballon Josephine.(Stone, Ralph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration July 8, 2024 Declaration of Josephine Ballon
Thursday, April 04, 2024
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/04 2:10 PM
NOTICE by Grinberg Avital, HateAid gGmbH, Ballon Josephine of Submitted Matter under L.R. 7-13 (Stone, Ralph)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 12/15 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert S. Green (Green, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
18 18 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Tue 12/05 3:19 PM
REPLY Related [+] in Further Support of Application for Discovery under 28 U.S.C. § 1782 filed byGrinberg Avital, HateAid gGmbH, Ballon Josephine.(Stone, Ralph)
Related: [-] 1 Ex Parte Application
Att: 1 Declaration Dec 4, 2023 Decl. of Josephine Ballon
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/29 8:40 AM
Set Deadline as to1 Ex Parte Application, See Docket No. 17 : Replies due by 12/5/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
17 17 order Order Tue 11/28 11:20 AM
ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING the Applicants to file a reply brief of fifteen pages or less in support of Dkt. No. 1 their application to take discovery pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 by December 5, 2023. The briefing will be deemed complete upon receipt of the Applicants' reply unless the Court orders otherwise. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
16 16 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 11/27 2:24 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byX CORP..(Hawk, James)
Related: [-] 1 Ex Parte Application
Att: 1 Declaration of Markus Langen,
Att: 2 Declaration of Marcella Barreto
Monday, November 13, 2023
15 15 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 11/13 9:53 AM
ORDER by Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr, granting 14 Stipulation to Extend time for X Corp. to respond to application to and including November 27, 2023. (kc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
14 14 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 11/10 12:57 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re1 Ex Parte Application,12 Order filed by X CORP.. (Hawk, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
13 13 service Affidavit of Service Fri 11/03 1:41 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Application to take Discovery under 28 USC 1782 and accompanying supporting papers, along with Order Directing Service served on X Corp. on 10/27/2023, filed by Grinberg Avital, HateAid gGmbH, Ballon Josephine. (Stone, Ralph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order Wed 10/25 1:05 PM
ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/25/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/06 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph M. Stone (Stone, Ralph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
10 10 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/04 1:00 PM
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Ralph M. Stone. (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 09/27 2:04 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO.8 . Your address on the application does not match the address listed on the docket. Either update your address on the docket or e-file a revised application (with attachments) with the correct address reflected on it. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:23-mc-80235-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/27 11:46 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Ralph M. Stone ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18683997.) filed by Grinberg Avital, HateAid gGmbH, Ballon Josephine.(Stone, Ralph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, September 21, 2023
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 09/21 11:35 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. Please disregard docket no. 6. The case management conference was set on the wrong case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Telephonic Hearing (AT&T) Thu 09/21 11:27 AM
** Disregard Docket No. 6. See Docket No. 7 .** CLERK'S NOTICE CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for December 5, 2023, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by November 28th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:23-mc-80235-HSG. The December 5, 2023 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for a telephonic case management conference are required to dial-in at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/21/2023 (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/21 9:24 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 9/21/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
4 4 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 09/20 1:32 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/20 1:05 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Grinberg Avital, HateAid gGmbH, Ballon Josephine.. (Green, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
2 2 utility ~Util - Miscellaneous Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/19 3:16 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Ex Parte Application (Miscellaneous Case Opening) Tue 09/19 1:46 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1782 against Twitter International Unlimited Company (TIUC) ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number ACANDC-18658310.). Filed by Grinberg Avital, Ballon Josephine, HateAid gGmbH.(Green, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Josephine Ballon,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Proposed Order