California Northern District Court
Judge:P Casey Pitts
Referred: Pslc Mbi
Case #: 5:23-cv-04800
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Oct 07, 2024
Defendant
Eric Cafrades
Defendant
Eric Lafrades
Plaintiff
Gregory Scott Van Huisen

GPO Apr 15 2024
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND and granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 4/15/2024. (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 4/15/2024) cc: Order mailed to plaintiff and prison's trust account office by NMC.Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Oct 07 2024
of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 10/7/2024. The Clerk shall close the file. (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 10/7/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
18 18 appeal USCA Memorandum Fri 04/25 1:15 PM
USCA Memorandum (affirmed) as to14 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Gregory Scott Van Huisen (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
17 17 appeal USCA Order Mon 01/06 4:02 PM
ORDER of USCA as to14 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Gregory Scott Van Huisen (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
16 16 appeal USCA Order Thu 10/24 3:00 PM
USCA REFERRAL NOTICE as to14 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Gregory Scott Van Huisen (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
15 15 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 10/23 1:02 PM
USCA Docketing Notice and Case Number 24-6485 for14 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
14 14 appeal Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit Mon 10/21 3:04 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals and MOTION for IFP filed by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. Appeal of Order Dismissing Case12 , Judgment13 - (IFP Requested). (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
13 13 order Judgment Mon 10/07 4:16 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 10/7/2024. (nmc, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 10/07 4:14 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 10/7/2024. The Clerk shall close the file. (nmc, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
11 11 misc Request Fri 08/02 6:41 PM
REQUEST for Status Summary and Docket Sheet filed by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/31 12:16 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eric Cafrades. Filed by Gregory Scott Van Huisen.(slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Document PSP Wed 05/22 9:37 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Gregory Scott Van Huisen.(slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 05/15 11:58 AM
ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Amended Complaint due by 7/19/2024. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 5/15/2024.(nmc, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Document PSP Fri 04/19 4:27 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint filed by Gregory Scott Van Huisen.(slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, April 15, 2024
6 6 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 04/15 12:31 PM
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND and granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 4/15/2024. (nmc, COURT USER) cc: Order mailed to plaintiff and prison's trust account office by NMC. Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 24, 2023
5 5 misc Request Mon 11/27 6:18 PM
REQUEST filed by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
4 4 oth_sup Exhibits Fri 10/13 4:52 PM
Pleading page for a subsequent document. "Original Complaint" Declaration Statement made under Oath; Request for Admission filed byGregory Scott Van Huisen.(sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, October 05, 2023
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP Thu 10/05 5:59 PM
APPLICATION AND DECLARATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
2 2 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: IFP Tue 09/19 3:39 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/27/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/19 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Eric Lafrades (Filing fee $ 402.). Filed byGregory Scott Van Huisen.(mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope