California Northern District Court
Judge:Trina L Thompson
Case #: 3:23-cv-04803
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1126 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Oct 13, 2023
Case in other court:Texas Western, 6:23-cv-00051
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 2:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Google LLC
Represented By
Mark Liang
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Bill Trac
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Brian Christopher Banner
Slayden Grubert Beard PLLC
contact info
Nathaniel Legum
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Darin Walter Snyder
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Luann L. Simmons
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Darin W Snyder
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Flick Intelligence, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Eugene Kubiak
Ramey LLP
contact info
William P. Ramey, III
Ramey & Schwaller, LLP
contact info
Susan S.Q. Kalra
Ramey LLP
contact info

GPO Oct 13 2023
ORDER ON 59 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(i)(B). Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 10/13/2023. (rfm, COURT USER) (Filed on 10/13/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, October 13, 2023
60 60 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 10/13 3:56 PM
ORDER ON 59 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(i)(B). Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 10/13/2023. (rfm, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
59 59 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 10/13 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Flick Intelligence, LLC(Kalra, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
58 58 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/13 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Susan S.Q. Kalra (Kalra, Susan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
57 57 order Order Thu 10/12 8:43 PM
ORDER VACATING MOTIONS 26 , 27 , AND 47 . In light of the cases transfer, the Court vacates pending motions 26 , 27 , and 47 . The parties may re-calendar these motions if needed based on the following briefing schedule: opening briefs for a motion to dismiss should be submitted by January 23, 2024 and if needed, a hearing will be scheduled for March 5, 2024. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 10/12/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tltlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]