California Central District Court
Judge:Monica Ramirez Almadani
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:23-cv-07837
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 2:29 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Rodney Haynes
Defendant
Nettax LLC
Represented By
Jake Sesti
Higgs Fletcher And Mack LLP
contact info
Derek W Paradis
Higgs Fletcher And Mack LLP
contact info
Phillip Constantine Samouris
Higgs Fletcher And Mack LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gregg Kasubuchi
5616 Hallowell Avenue
Arcadia, CA 91007
Defendant
State Tax Credits, LLC
6055 E Washington Blvd #690
Commerce, CA 90040
Plaintiff
First Capitol Consulting Inc.
Represented By
Kenneth G Katel
Musick, Peeler And Garrett LLP
contact info
Kristine Edna Kwong
Musick Peeler And Garrett LLP
contact info
Natasha M Wu
Musick, Peeler And Garrett LLP
contact info
Peter Joseph Diedrich
Musick Peeler And Garrett LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Gregg Kasubuchi
an individual 5616 Hallowell Avenue
Arcadia, CA 91007
ThirdParty Defendant
State Tax Credits, LLC
a California limited liability company 6055 E Washington Blvd #690
Commerce, CA 90040
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Nettax LLC
Represented By
Jake Sesti
Higgs Fletcher And Mack LLP
contact info
Derek W Paradis
Higgs Fletcher And Mack LLP
contact info
Phillip Constantine Samouris
Higgs Fletcher And Mack LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
100 100 order Leave to File Document Under Seal Wed 04/30 11:20 AM
ORDER GRANTING NETTAX, LLC'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting96 APPLICATION to Seal Document(s). (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (hr)
Related: [-]
99 99 minutes Telephone Conference Compel ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 04/30 9:48 AM
MINUTES & ORDER RE: (1) DEFENDANT NETTAX LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE A FULL AND COMPLETE TRADE SECRET DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Dkt. 87); (2) PLAINTIFF FIRST CAPITOL CONSULTING, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL NETTAX, LLC'S RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS OF $1,000 (Dkt. No. 88); AND (3) DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. A discovery conference is set on May 9, 2025 at 2:30 p.m. by Zoom. The steps to access the Zoom webinar are available on Judge Rosenberg's Procedures & Schedules page (www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-alicia-g-rosenberg). Granting in part and denying in part Motion to Compel87 ; Granting in part and denying in part Motion to Compel88 . (See Order for Further Details). Court Recorder: CS 04/29/2025. (kl)
Related: [-]
98 98 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 04/29 10:29 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. On the Court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss85 , currently set for hearing on May 5, 2025, is taken off calendar and submitted. No appearances are required on that date. The court may order further briefing or other proceedings, at any time, as appropriate. Order to issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
97 97 attyseal Sealed Declaration in Support Mon 04/28 5:33 PM
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal96 filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Nettax LLC.(Samouris, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted Document Exhibits A-D
96 96 motion Leave to File Document Under Seal Mon 04/28 5:31 PM
APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Nettax LLC.(Samouris, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jake D. Sesti in Support of Nettax, LLC's Notice of Application and Application for Leave to File Under Seal,
Att: 2 Redacted Document Exhibits A-D,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, April 25, 2025
95 95 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 04/25 3:14 PM
REPLY In Support First MOTION to Compel Nettax's Discovery Responses 88 filed by Plaintiff First Capitol Consulting Inc.. (Wu, Natasha)
Related: [-]
94 94 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 04/25 11:39 AM
REPLY in support of MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Provide a Full and Complete Trade Secret Disclosure Statement 87 filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Nettax LLC.(Samouris, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jake D. Sesti in Support of NetTax LLC's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Nettax LLC's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Provide a Full and Complete Trade Secret Disclosure Statement